EP3310043 - HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY AND DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/16] | HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
[2024/10] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yuichiro c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16807438.3 | 06.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016JP66792 | Priority number, date | JP20150117762 | 10.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015117762 | [2018/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016199731 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3310043 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G09G5/38 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04N13/20 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (US);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06F1/1686 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G09G3/001 (US);
G09G5/00 (US);
G09G5/32 (EP);
G09G5/36 (US);
G09G5/38 (EP);
H04N13/00 (EP,US);
H04N13/239 (US);
H04N13/296 (US);
H04N13/30 (EP,US);
H04N13/332 (US);
H04N13/383 (US);
H04N5/2628 (US);
H04N5/64 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0464 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | H04N7/18, G02B27/02, G09G5/00, G09G5/36, H04N5/64, H04N13/00, G06F3/0481, G06F3/01, G02B27/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/16] | H04N7/18, G02B27/02, G09G5/00, G09G5/36, H04N5/64, H04N13/00, H04N13/02, H04N13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGE UND ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/10] | English: | HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY AND DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD | [2024/10] | French: | VISIOCASQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE | [2024/10] |
Former [2018/16] | KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGE, ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | ||
Former [2018/16] | HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY, DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
Former [2018/16] | VISIOCASQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE ET PROGRAMME | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2017 | Translation filed | 04.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 03.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000101898 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] ** paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] *; | [X]WO2014077046 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [P]EP2922049 (SONY CORP [JP]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0135] * | International search | [A]JPH08313843 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [A] 1-7* , paragraphs [0006], [0012] to [0013], [0017], [0027] to [0028]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2000101898 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 4-7 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0013], [0016], [0022], [0026]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [YA]JP2008252711 (NIKON CORP) [Y] 1-2, 4-7 * , paragraphs [0031], [0044] (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [YA]JP2014127744 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 5 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0027]; fig. 1 to 7 & US 2014/0176722 A1 paragraphs [0037] to [0040]; fig. 1 to 7 & CN 103905721 A & KR 10-2014-0082921 A * [A] 3 |