EP3309181 - CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI, Takuro c/o Zeon Corporation 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Saki c/o Zeon Corporation 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 03 /
IIZUKA, Takashi c/o Zeon Corporation 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16807548.9 | 09.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016JP67186 | Priority number, date | JP20150118421 | 11.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015118421 | [2018/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016199842 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309181 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F236/04, C08L9/00, C08C19/25, B60C1/00, C08F4/08, C08F8/42, C08K3/36 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
C08F236/04 (EP,US);
C08F8/42 (KR,US);
B60C1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0016 (US);
C08C19/25 (EP,KR,US);
C08F36/04 (KR);
C08F4/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/30 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | C08C19/25, B60C1/00, C08F4/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | KONJUGIERTES DIENPOLYMER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KONJUGIERTEM DIENPOLYMER | [2018/16] | English: | CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER | [2018/16] | French: | POLYMÈRE DIÉNIQUE CONJUGUÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMÈRE DIÉNIQUE CONJUGUÉ | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2017 | Translation filed | 07.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 07.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2012025788 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO ) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2433945 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9* examples 5-10; table 2 *; | [A]JP2012111983 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012165464 (HOGAN TERRENCE E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * examples 8,16,17,18; claims 1,18-20 *; | [AP]WO2015098264 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2015199226 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-9 * the whole document *; | EP3088423 [ ] (ZEON CORP [JP]); | EP3162814 [ ] (ZEON CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2010120925 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-9 * , claims & US 2010/0099866 A1 claims & EP 2180001 A1 *; | [A]JP2010215715 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-9 * , claims; examples & US 2010/0234502 A1 claims; examples & CN 101851349 A & KR 10-2010-0103411 A *; | [A]JP2011006543 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [A] 1-9* , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013129761 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2015098264 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2015199226 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2016037543 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [PA] 1-9 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2016069447 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [PA] 1-9 * , claims; paragraph [0055] (Family: none) * |