EP3240096 - BATTERY PACK PROTECTING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jae-Chan LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sooryoung LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Cheoltaek LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16807652.9 | 12.02.2016 | [2017/44] | WO2016KR01413 | Priority number, date | KR20150081392 | 09.06.2015 Original published format: KR 20150081392 | [2017/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016200009 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240096 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H01M2/34 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,CN,US);
H02H7/18 (CN);
H01M10/482 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/4207 (CN);
H01M10/4228 (US);
H01M10/48 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/574 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2010/4271 (CN);
H01M2200/00 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | H01M10/42, H01M10/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACKSCHUTZSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2017/44] | English: | BATTERY PACK PROTECTING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2017/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DE BLOC-BATTERIE | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2017 | Translation filed | 27.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 04.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2105982 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007]; figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] *; | [X]US2011095623 (DOH WHAN-SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraphs [0038] , [ 0051]; figures 1, 3, 6 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] * | International search | [A]KR19980055172 (KIA MOTORS CORPORATION) [A] 1-14* See claim 1. *; | [A]KR20100048354 (DAESUNG ELECTRIC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See claim 1. *; | [X]KR101097248B (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) [X] 1-14 * See claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0023], [0027], [0029], [0040], [0049]; figure 6. *; | [X]KR20120004129 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-14 * See claims 1, 7; paragraph [0041]. *; | [A]KR20120097107 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See claims 1-2, 4. * |