EP3307997 - EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Wen-Mei 912 Blossom Circle Dayton, New Jersey 08810 / US | 02 /
HOCHMUTH, John K. 333 River Park Drive Raritan, New Jersey 08869 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/16] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16808420.0 | 10.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016US36980 | Priority number, date | US201562174856P | 12.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562174856 P | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016201295 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307997 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3307997 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/10, F01N3/20, B01J23/44, F01N13/00, B01J35/04, C01C1/02, F01N3/08, F01N3/28, B01J23/02, B01J23/42, B01D53/94 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,KR,RU,US);
F01N3/103 (KR);
F01N3/2803 (US);
B01D53/9418 (US);
B01D53/9422 (US);
B01D53/945 (US);
B01D53/9472 (US);
B01D53/9477 (US);
B01J23/02 (US);
B01J23/42 (US);
B01J23/44 (US);
B01J35/56 (US);
C01C1/02 (US);
F01N3/0814 (US);
F01N3/0842 (US);
F01N3/101 (KR);
F01N3/2073 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (US);
B01D2255/1023 (US);
B01D2255/2042 (US);
B01D2255/9032 (US);
B01D2255/91 (US);
B01D2255/9155 (US);
F01N2240/25 (KR,US);
F01N2510/0682 (EP,US);
F01N2510/0684 (US);
F01N2570/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | F01N3/10, F01N3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/16] | English: | EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2018/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 21.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2016 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | IE | 10.06.2020 | LU | 10.06.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.06.2016 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013081378 (BISAIJI YUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2A,2B; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0038] *; | [Y]DE102013205197 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [Y] 11,12 * figure 1 * * pages 9,11,17, *; | [XYI]US2014248200 (WAN CHUNG-ZONG [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14,15 * figure 1; example 1; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0026] * [Y] 11,12 [I] 13; | [A]EP2824296 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 ** paragraph [0046] * | International search | [A]US2010107606 (NARAYANASWAMY KUSHAL [US], et al) [A] 1-27* See paragraphs [0037]-[0053] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]US2013081378 (BISAIJI YUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-27 * See abstract, paragraphs [0031]-[0038], [0055]-[0058], and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2014271429 (KAZI M SHAHJAHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * See abstract, paragraphs [0039]-[0040], [0058], [0060], [0094], and claims 1-12. *; | [Y]US2014260214 (XUE WEN-MEI [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * See abstract and claims 1-6. *; | [Y]US2014301923 (TANG WEIYONG [US], et al) [Y] 11-20, 24-26 * See abstract, paragraphs [0099]-[0101], [0123]-[0129], and claims 1-12. * |