EP3307499 - MACHINES AND METHODS FOR CUTTING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states URSCHEL LABORATORIES, INC. 1200 Cutting Edge Drive Chesterton, IN 46304 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANT, James A. 336 Mt. Jackson Chesterton, Indiana 46304 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | TLIP Limited 14 King Street Leeds LS1 2HL / GB | ||
Former [2018/16] | TLIP Limited Leeds Innovation Centre 103 Clarendon Road Leeds LS2 9DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 16808496.0 | 13.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016US37143 | Priority number, date | US201562174985P | 12.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562174985 P | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016201400 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307499 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3307499 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/36, B26D3/26, A23N15/00, A22C17/00, B26D1/03, B26D7/06, B26D3/28, B26D7/26, B26D1/00 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
B26D7/0691 (EP,US);
B26D1/03 (EP,US);
B26D3/28 (EP,US);
B26D7/2614 (EP,US);
B26D2001/006 (EP,US);
B26D2210/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | B26D1/36, B26D3/26, A23N15/00, A22C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON PRODUKTEN | [2018/16] | English: | MACHINES AND METHODS FOR CUTTING PRODUCTS | [2018/16] | French: | MACHINES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR COUPER DES PRODUITS | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 17.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | IT | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | IE | 13.06.2023 | LU | 13.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
IE | 13.06.2023 | ||
LU | 13.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
IE | 13.06.2023 | ||
LU | 13.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
LU | 13.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 05.10.2022 | |
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | FI | 05.10.2022 | |
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 05.10.2022 | |
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 05.10.2022 | |
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 05.10.2022 | |
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NO | 05.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014007751 (MICHEL ENRIQUE [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * rake-off-angle 27 degrees, or less than 23, 20 or 17 degrees; paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044]; figures 11a-11e *; | [I]US2014290451 (JACKO MICHAEL SCOT [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * "relatively low rake-off angle"; paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-14 *; | [T] - John Doe, "Urschel (R) Model CC", (20180131), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.urschel.com/sites/urschel.com/files/specs-model-cc.pdf, (20190115), XP055542088 [T] 1-16 | International search | [A]US4391172 (GALLAND LESLEY A, et al) [A] 1-16* See abstract, column 3, line 55 - column 6, line 7, and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US4511586 (FITZWATER MARGARET [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * See abstract, column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 15, and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]US2008022822 (JACKO MICHAEL S [US], et al) [Y] 9-10 * See abstract, paragraph [0028], and figure 4F. *; | [XY]US2014083266 (BUCKS BRENT L [US]) [X] 1-8, 11-16 * See abstract, paragraphs [0055]-[0060], [0069], and figures 6-8, 21-22. * [Y] 9-10; | [A]WO2014048582 (FRITO LAY TRADING CO GMBH [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * See abstract, paragraphs [0061]-[0068], and figures 1-2. * |