EP3391451 - STAND-ALONE SYSTEM FOR CLAMPING A HIGH-TEMPERATURE SOEC/SOFC STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYTIER, Magali 15 allée des Peupliers 38250 Villard De Lans / FR | 02 /
BERNARD, Charlotte 635 route de Bonneville 74130 Contamine Sur Arve / FR | 03 /
GIROUD, Pascal 738 route de Corps 38410 Saint Martin D'uriage / FR | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2018/43] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16809071.0 | 12.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP80655 | Priority number, date | FR20150062384 | 15.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1562384 | [2018/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017102657 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391451 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3391451 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/248, H01M8/2428, C25B1/00, C25B1/04, C25B9/65, C25B9/73, C25B9/75, C25B11/036 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
H01M8/248 (EP,US);
C25B1/00 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B11/036 (EP,US);
C25B9/65 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (EP,US);
C25B9/75 (EP,US);
H01M8/028 (US);
H01M8/2428 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M8/0273 (EP,US);
H01M8/2465 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | H01M8/248, H01M8/2428, C25B9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIGENSTÄNDIGES SYSTEM ZUM KLEMMEN EINES HOCHTEMPERATUR-SOEC/SOFC-STAPELS | [2022/43] | English: | STAND-ALONE SYSTEM FOR CLAMPING A HIGH-TEMPERATURE SOEC/SOFC STACK | [2018/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SERRAGE AUTONOME D'UN EMPILEMENT À OXYDES SOLIDES DE TYPE SOEC/SOFC À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/43] | EIGENSTÄNDIGES SYSTEM ZUM KLEMMEN EINES HOCHTEMPERATUR-SOC/SOFC-STAPELS | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 18.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07145492 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 18 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0113450 (STICHTING ENERGIE [NL], et al) [Y] 2,6 * page 2, lines 22,23 *; | [Y]US2002142204 (PREDIGER DENNIS [CA], et al) [Y] 22-26 * page 1, paragraph 8 *; | [A]JP3465379B (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [XYI]JP2007294330 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,12,20,21 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0035] , [0037] , [0052]; figure 4 * [Y] 2,6,13-19,22-26 [I] 10; | [Y]US2010012503 (HINATSU JIM [CA], et al) [Y] 18 * claims 27,29 *; | [Y]US2012325654 (LE GALLO PATRICK [FR], et al) [Y] 13-17 * page 2, paragraphs 31,33,34 - page 4, paragraphs 83-86 * * page 5, paragraph 92 *; | [Y]EP2595231 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 51 - column 6, lines 30-40 *; | [XYI]EP2647076 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,12,20,21 * column 3, lines 9-12,22-24 - column 6, lines 6-11,20-27,35-45 * * column 7, lines 22-27 - column 8, lines 28-30 * [Y] 5,13-19,22-26 [I] 3,4,7-9,11; | [Y]US2014242492 (EDMONSTON DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 22-26 * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 32 * * page 3, paragraphs 42,43 - page 4, paragraphs 51,53 *; | [Y]US2015311559 (TSUKAMOTO KEIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 19 * page 2, paragraphs 20,33 - page 3, paragraph 48 * |