EP3386960 - FLOCOUMAFENE STEREOISOMER, COMPOSITION AND RODENTICIDE BAIT CONTAINING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TARGET RODENT PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/42] | STEREOISOMER OF FLOCOUMAFEN, COMPOSITION AND RODENTICIDE BAIT COMPRISING SAME, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TARGET RODENT PESTS | ||
[2021/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liphatech "Bonnel" 47480 Pont-du-Casse / FR | For all designated states Institut Enseignement Supérieur et Recherche en Alimentation Santé Animale Sciences Agronomiques et Environnement (Vet Agro Sup) 1 Avenue Bourgelat 69280 Marcy-l'Etoile / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states Liphatech "Bonnel" 47480 Pont-du-Casse / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut Enseignement Supérieur et Recherche en Alimentation Santé Animale Sciences Agronomiques et Environnement (Vet Agro Su 1 Avenue Bourgelat 69280 Marcy-l'Etoile / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUEL, Hervé Le Bourg 47310 Moncaut / FR | 02 /
BENOIT, Etienne 27A rue de Montribloud 69009 Lyon / FR | 03 /
FOUREL, Isabelle 13 rue du Bourg 01700 Miribel / FR | 04 /
LATTARD, Virginie 27A rue de Montribloud 69009 Lyon / FR | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | BARRE LAFORGUE 35, rue Lancefoc 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés 35, rue Lancefoc 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 16809337.5 | 06.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016EP79860 | Priority number, date | FR20150062164 | 11.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1562164 | [2018/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017097749 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3386960 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/56, A01N43/16 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
C07D311/56 (EP,US);
A01N25/004 (US);
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
C07B57/00 (US);
B01D15/3833 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/16, A01N25/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | FLOCOUMAFENSTEREOISOMER, DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND RATTENKÖDER SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR GEZIELTEN BEKÄMPFUNG VON NAGETIEREN | [2021/13] | English: | FLOCOUMAFENE STEREOISOMER, COMPOSITION AND RODENTICIDE BAIT CONTAINING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TARGET RODENT PESTS | [2021/13] | French: | STEREO-ISOMERE DU FLOCOUMAFENE, COMPOSITION ET APPAT RODONTICIDE LE COMPRENANT, PROCEDE DE LUTTE CONTRE DES RONGEURS CIBLES NUISIBLES | [2021/13] |
Former [2018/42] | STEREOISOMER VON FLOCOUMAFEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND RODENTIZIDER KÖDER DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON BESTIMMTEN NAGERSCHÄDLINGEN | ||
Former [2018/42] | STEREOISOMER OF FLOCOUMAFEN, COMPOSITION AND RODENTICIDE BAIT COMPRISING SAME, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TARGET RODENT PESTS | ||
Former [2018/42] | STÉRÉO-ISOMÈRE DU FLOCOUMAFÈNE, COMPOSITION ET APPÂT RODONTICIDE LE COMPRENANT, PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE DES RONGEURS CIBLES NUISIBLES | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 26.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0098629 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-11 * page 14 - page 15; claims 1-18 *; | [A]EP0147052 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-11 * page 7, lines 20-24;; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0175466 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-11 * example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A] - JUNG, JAE-CHUL ET AL, "Total synthesis of flocoumafen via Knoevenagel condensation and intramolecular ring cyclization: general access to natural products", MOLECULES, (2012), vol. 17, doi:10.3390/MOLECULES17022091, pages 2091 - 2102, XP002755590 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/MOLECULES17022091 |