EP3377786 - RIGID CHAIN LINK AND RIGID CHAIN EQUIPPED WITH SUCH A LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serapid France 453, route de Dieppe 76660 Londinieres / FR | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIGNEUR, Ivan 51bis Rue Montigny Apt. 16 76200 Dieppe / FR | 02 /
NOVICK, Philippe 58 Rue des Canadiens 76630 Envermeu / FR | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16809495.1 | 15.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016FR52953 | Priority number, date | FR20150060948 | 16.11.2015 Original published format: FR 1560948 | [2018/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017085389 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377786 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3377786 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/20 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
F16G13/20 (EP,KR,US);
E05F11/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLIED FÜR STARRE KETTE UND MIT SOLCH EINEM GLIED VERSEHENE STARRE KETTE | [2018/39] | English: | RIGID CHAIN LINK AND RIGID CHAIN EQUIPPED WITH SUCH A LINK | [2018/39] | French: | MAILLON DE CHAÎNE RIGIDE ET CHAÎNE RIGIDE ÉQUIPÉE D'UN TEL MAILLON | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 22.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SI | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | LU | 15.11.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
LU | 15.11.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2219125 (BREMER NORMAN C); | [XI]BE642350 (COMPAGNIE DES TRANSMISSIONS MECANIQUES SEINE-DOUBS-ISERE); | [X]AU2010212303B (AZUMA DESIGN PTY LTD [AU]) | Examination | CN204025533U | by applicant | FR2134196 | FR2345626 | FR2573832 | FR2786476 |