EP3389638 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING PIMOBENDAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceva Santé Animale 10 Avenue de La Ballastière 33500 Libourne / FR | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA, Rosita CEVA-SOGEVAL Campus 200 Avenue de Mayenne - BP 2227 53022 Laval Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
CHARLES, Romain CEVA-SOGEVAL Campus 200 Avenue de Mayenne - BP 2227 53022 Laval Cedex 9 / FR | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16809857.2 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP81364 | Priority number, date | EP20150307048 | 17.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15307048 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103054 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389638 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3389638 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/501 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/2013 (EP);
A61K31/501 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/36 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PIMOBENDAN | [2018/43] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING PIMOBENDAN | [2018/43] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPORTANT DU PIMOBENDANE | [2023/13] |
Former [2018/43] | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT DU PIMOBENDAN | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 25.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SI | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2010055119 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2013135852 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMED [DE]); | [YD]EP1725218 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMED [DE]) |