EP3389431 - DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HAIR HAVING A HEATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/43] | COSMETIC PRODUCT REFILL FOR A DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HAIR HAVING A HEATING ELEMENT, AND DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HAIR INCLUDING SUCH A REFILL | ||
[2024/25] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2020/04] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBAUGE, Anne 7 rue Touzet Gaillard 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | 02 /
FEREYRE, Régis 4 rue de la Victoire 69003 Lyon / FR | 03 /
BONNEMAIRE, Baptiste 3 rue des pépinières 69005 Lyon / FR | 04 /
MAISONNEUVE, Martial 20 rue Claude Debussy Cidex 852 38090 Villefontaine / FR | 05 /
XAVIER, Vacheron 4 Bis Chemin de Cadou 69740 Genas / FR | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | SEB Développement Direction Propriété industrielle - Brevets 112, chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB - CS 90229 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16809891.1 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP81606 | Priority number, date | FR20150062754 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1562754 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103228 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389431 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A45D1/04, A45D2/00, A45D7/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A45D1/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A45D1/06 (KR,US);
A45D1/00 (CN);
A45D2/001 (EP,KR,US);
A45D7/06 (CN);
A45D2001/002 (CN,US);
A45D2001/008 (CN,KR,US);
A45D2007/002 (EP,KR);
A45D2034/002 (KR);
A45D2034/005 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | A45D1/04, A45D2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAAR MIT EINEM HEIZELEMENT | [2024/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HAIR HAVING A HEATING ELEMENT | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE CHEVEUX AYANT UN ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT | [2024/25] |
Former [2018/43] | KOSMETIKPRODUKTNACHFÜLLUNG FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAAR MIT EINEM HEIZELEMENT UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAAR MIT SOLCH EINER | ||
Former [2018/43] | COSMETIC PRODUCT REFILL FOR A DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HAIR HAVING A HEATING ELEMENT, AND DEVICE FOR TREATING THE HAIR INCLUDING SUCH A REFILL | ||
Former [2018/43] | RECHARGE DE PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE POUR DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE CHEVEUX AYANT UN ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT, ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE CHEVEUX COMPRENANT UNE TELLE RECHARGE | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 24.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB243634 (ROGLER, T.) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,11,12,15 * page 1, line 53 - page 2, line 20; figure 3 *[I] 13,14 | by applicant | WO2004041021 | WO2009015027 | US2009025247 | WO2009078046 | WO2013045331 | WO2013090896 |