EP3322295 - COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Queensland The University of Queensland St Lucia, Queensland 4072 / AU | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTER, Neena 210 Brimblecombe Circuit Pullenvale, Queensland 4069 / AU | 02 /
XU, Zhi Ping 201 Horizon Drive Westlake, Queensland 4074 / AU | [2018/42] |
Former [2018/21] | 01 /
MITTER, Neena 9 Kauri Place Seventeen Mile Rocks, Queensland 4073 / AU | ||
02 /
XU, Zhi Ping 201 Horizon Drive Westlake, Queensland 4074 / AU | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2018/21] | Application number, filing date | 16810635.9 | 17.06.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016AU50517 | Priority number, date | AU20150902373 | 19.06.2015 Original published format: AU 2015902373 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016201523 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3322295 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3322295 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/60, C12N15/11, C12N15/113, A01N25/08, A01N25/10, A01N25/22, A01P7/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
A01N25/22 (US);
A01N25/08 (US);
A01N57/16 (US);
A01N63/60 (EP);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12N2310/14 (US);
C12N2310/3511 (US);
C12N2320/32 (EP,US);
C12N2320/51 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N57/16, A01N25/00, A01N25/22 (US);
A01N63/60, A01N25/08, A01N25/10, A01N25/22 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/02] | A01N57/16, A01N25/22, A01N25/08, C12N15/113, C12N15/11 | ||
Former IPC [2018/21] | A01N57/16, A01N25/22, A01N25/08, C12N15/113 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/21] | English: | COMPOSITION | [2018/21] | French: | COMPOSITION | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 03.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | IT | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | IE | 17.06.2023 | LU | 17.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
IE | 17.06.2023 | ||
LU | 17.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 17.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009010888 (PAINE MARK JOHN INGRAHAM [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0007] - [0037]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2014122648 (BG NEGEV TECHNOLOGIES & APPLIC LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] - [0049] - [0058] - [0077] , [0108] - [0113]; figure -; example -; claim - * | International search | [A]US2014150134 (LI HAICHAO [CN], et al) [A] 0* See whole of document *; | [A] - ZHANG, X. et al., "Chitosan/double-stranded RNA nanoparticle-mediated RNA interference to silence chitin synthase genes through larval feeding in the African malaria mosquito (Anopheles gambiae", Insect Molecular Biology, (20100000), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 683 - 693, XP055337613 [A] 0 * . See whole of document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2583.2010.01029.x | [A] - ZHOU, J. et al., "Nanoparticle-based delivery of RNAi therapeutics: progress and challenges", Pharmaceuticals, (20130000), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 85 - 107, XP055337621 [A] 0 * . See whole of document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ph6010085 | [A] - YU, N. et al., "Delivery of dsRNA for RNAi in insects: an overview and future directions", Insect Science, (20130000), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 4 - 14, XP055337622 [A] 0 * . See whole of document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1744-7917.2012.01534.x | [A] - HE, B. et al., "Fluorescent nanoparticle delivered dsRNA toward genetic control of insect pests", Advanced Materials, (20130000), vol. 25, no. 33, pages 4580 - 4584, XP055337626 [A] 0 * . See whole of document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201301201 | by applicant | WO2014122648 | - ALLENWALKER, "Saliva of Lygus lineolaris digests double stranded ribonucleic acids", Journal of Insect Physiology, (20120000), vol. 58, doi:10.1016/j.jinsphys.2011.12.014, pages 391 - 396, XP055411969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jinsphys.2011.12.014 | - TENLLADO, F.J.R. DIAZ-RUIZ, "Double-stranded RNA-mediated interference with plant virus infection", Journal Virology, (20010000), vol. 75, doi:10.1128/JVI.75.24.12288-12297.2001, pages 12288 - 12297, XP055411603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.24.12288-12297.2001 | - WHYARD et al., "Ingested double stranded RNAs can act as species-specific insecticides", Insect Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, (20090000), vol. 39, doi:10.1016/j.ibmb.2009.09.007, pages 824 - 832, XP026777046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ibmb.2009.09.007 |