EP3312816 - FALLING ALARM BATH MAT SYSTEM USING SUSPENSION FLOATING TOUCH CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Appscomm Co., Ltd. Room 903 BlockC3 Chuangxin Building No.182 Science Avenue Science lndustry Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510663 / CN | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE, Liuping Rm 903, Block C3, Chuangxin Building No.182, Science Ave Science lndustry Zone Guangzhou Guangdong 510663 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Shangfeng Rm 903, Block C3, Chuangxin Building No.182, Science Ave Science lndustry Zone Guangzhou Guangdong 510663 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Daifu Rm 903, Block C3, Chuangxin Building No.182, Science Ave Science lndustry Zone Guangzhou Guangdong 510663 / CN | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Locas, Davide, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 16810922.1 | 03.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016CN84713 | Priority number, date | CN201510338666 | 17.06.2015 Original published format: CN201510338666 | [2018/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016202181 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312816 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/04 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G08B21/0461 (EP,CN,US);
G08B21/043 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | BADVORLEGERSYSTEM MIT STURZALARM MIT VERWENDUNG VON IN EINER AUFHÄNGUNG SCHWEBENDEN BERÜHRUNGSKONTROLLE | [2018/17] | English: | FALLING ALARM BATH MAT SYSTEM USING SUSPENSION FLOATING TOUCH CONTROL | [2018/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TAPIS DE BAIN AVEC ALARME SIGNALANT LES CHUTES, UTILISANT UNE COMMANDE TACTILE FLOTTANTE EN SUSPENSION | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2017 | Translation filed | 25.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 25.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 26.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2050426 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2010194525 (DO LYDIA MAI [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]WO2013171709 (FLORIM CERAMICHE S P A [IT]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2014307118 (MACKINNON RICHARD [CA], et al) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A] - JUWAN YOO ET AL, "Air Hook: Data preloading user interface", ICT CONVERGENCE (ICTC), 2012 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121015), doi:10.1109/ICTC.2012.6386805, ISBN 978-1-4673-4829-4, pages 163 - 167, XP032282505 [A] 1-7 * page 163, paragraph A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTC.2012.6386805 | International search | [PX]CN104900010 (GUANGDONG APPSCOMM CO LTD) [PX] 1-7 * claims 1-7 *; | [PX]CN204695503U (GUANGDONG APPSCOMM CO LTD) [PX] 1-7 * description, paragraphs [0017]-[0030] *; | [A]CN202373108U (UNIV XIAMEN TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-7 * description, paragraphs [0031]-[0037], figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN104519796 (ABCD INNOVATION) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103473889 (NANJING IOT SENSOR TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101972102 (UNIV ZHEJIANG) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102043500 (BEIJING IRTOUCH SYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20110033102 (MARIMILS OY [FI]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]IT1412165 (FLORIM CERAMICHE S P A [IT]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102376144 (UNIV CHINA MEDICAL) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |