EP3159563 - PLAIN BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiho Kogyo Co., Ltd 65, Midorigaoka 3-chome Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8502 / JP | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUBOI, Yoichiro c/o TAIHO KOGYO Co. Ltd. 65 Midorigaoka 3-chome Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8502 / JP | 02 /
YATSUDA, Koichi c/o TAIHO KOGYO Co. Ltd. 65 Midorigaoka 3-chome Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8502 / JP | 03 /
UEYAMA, Atsushi c/o TAIHO KOGYO Co. Ltd. 65 Midorigaoka 3-chome Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8502 / JP | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16811387.6 | 24.05.2016 | [2017/17] | WO2016JP65304 | Priority number, date | JP20150123785 | 19.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015123785 | [2017/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016203912 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3159563 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/10, F16C43/02, F16C9/02, // F16C33/08 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
F16C43/02 (EP,US);
F16C17/022 (US);
F16C17/10 (EP,US);
F16C33/046 (EP,US);
F16C33/08 (EP,US);
F16C9/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/17] | F16C43/02, F16C9/02, F16C17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Title | German: | GLEITLAGER | [2017/17] | English: | PLAIN BEARING | [2017/17] | French: | PALIER LISSE | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2017 | Translation filed | 17.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 17.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1386253 (VANDERVELL PRODUCTS LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 58 - line 93; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE4015256 (GLYCO METALL WERKE [DE]) [X] 1,2* column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 11; figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP2233759 (KS GLEITLAGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] *; | [X]JP2015110979 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *; | [AP]JP2015200381 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD) [AP] 1,2 * paragraph [0005]; figures 3, 6 * | International search | [A]JPS51124756 (VANDERVELL PRODUCTS LTD) [A] 1, 2 * , (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2015110979 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1, 2 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0025]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2015200381 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD) [PA] 1, 2* , paragraphs [0004] to [0005]; fig. 6 (Family: none) * |