EP3312846 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1, Marounouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [2018/25] |
Former [2018/17] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Atsushi 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 2990-293 / JP | 02 /
SENGA, Minoru 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 03 /
AIDA, Masao 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 16811727.3 | 16.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016JP68009 | Priority number, date | JP20150122371 | 17.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015122371 | [2018/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016204253 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3312846 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3312846 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/00, C01B25/14, H01M6/18, H01M10/0562, B01J19/20 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
C01B25/14 (EP,US);
B01J19/20 (US);
H01B13/00 (EP,US);
H01M10/0562 (EP,US);
H01M6/18 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
H01M2220/30 (US);
H01M2300/0068 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/17] | H01B13/00, C01B25/14, H01M6/18, H01M10/0562 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYTHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/17] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE PRODUCTION METHOD | [2018/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2017 | Translation filed | 15.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 15.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2007220377 ; | [XI]JP2012199003 ; | [X]JP2012243476 ; | [XI]DE1199737 (SCHWAN BLEISTIFT FABRIK) [X] 13 * figures 1-11; claims 1-3 * * the whole document * [I] 12; | [XI]US4824256 (HAERING ERWIN [DE], et al) [X] 13 * abstract * * claim 1 * * the whole document * [I] 12; | [XI]US6079865 (PLAVCAN DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 13 * figures 1,15; claim 1 * * the whole document * [I] 12; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 73, Database accession no. 2007-780989, XP002786415 & JP2007220377 A 20070830 (OHARA KK) [X] 1,11,13 * abstract * * citations refer to the machine translation to English * * the whole document * [I] 2-10,12 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 72, Database accession no. 2012-N20074, XP002786416 & JP2012199003 A 20121018 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KK) [X] 1,12,13 * abstract * * citations refer to the machine translation to English; paragraph [0040]; claims 6, 7 * * the whole document * [I] 2-11 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 82, Database accession no. 2012-Q99804, XP002786417 & JP2012243476 A 20121210 (NIPPON ZEON KK) [X] 12,13 * abstract * * citations refer to the machine translation to English; paragraph [0113] * * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2007220377 (OHARA KK) [Y] 1-13* , paragraph [0027] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012048884 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0004], [0018], [0020], [0022] to [0024], [0028] (Family: none) * |