EP3311263 - TECHNIQUES FOR RESOURCE DESCRIPTION FRAMEWORK MODELING WITHIN DISTRIBUTED DATABASE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2021 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUODB Inc. 215 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASSARI, Alberto Via Prasca 19/5 16148 Genova / IT | 02 /
MCNEILL, Keith David 4 Leonard Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 03 /
LEVIN, Oleg 504 Tumbling Hawk Action, Massachusetts 01718 / US | 04 /
ABREVAYA, Adam 113 Drake Road Burlington, Massachusetts 01803 / US | 05 /
PROCTOR, Seth Theodore 228 Broadway Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte, et al Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16812485.7 | 17.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016US37977 | Priority number, date | US201514744546 | 19.06.2015 Original published format: US201514744546 | [2018/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016205588 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3311263 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00, G06F17/30 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
G06F16/25 (EP,US);
G06F16/2228 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/17] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR RESSOURCENBESCHREIBUNGSRAHMENMODELLIERUNG INNERHALB VERTEILTER DATENBANKSYSTEME | [2018/17] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR RESOURCE DESCRIPTION FRAMEWORK MODELING WITHIN DISTRIBUTED DATABASE SYSTEMS | [2018/17] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE DESCRIPTION DE RESSOURCES POUR MODÉLISATION D'INFRASTRUCTURE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE BASES DE DONNÉES DISTRIBUÉS | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 12.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 29.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006235823 (CHONG EUGENE I [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US2011225167 (BHATTACHARJEE BISHWARANJAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2012102022 (MIRANKER DANIEL PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [I]US8756237 (STILLERMAN MATTHEW A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 4 - column 10 *; | [A]US2014172914 (ELNIKETY SAMEH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] *; | [A]US2014310260 (WU ZHE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US2013110766 (PROMHOUSE GARY J [CA], et al) [Y] 5, 7, 12, 20 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0093] *; | [XY]US8756237 (STILLERMAN MATTHEW A [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 6, 8-11, 13-19 * , entire document, especially Abstract; col 1, In 21-29; col 1, In 66 to col 2, In 10; col 4, In 11-21; col 5, In 27-39; col 7, In 35-48; col 9, In 29-44; col 10, In 36-55 * [Y] 5, 7, 12, 20; | [A]US2014279881 (TAN WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2014297676 (BHATIA ANIL [IN], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document * |