EP3386419 - SYMMETRICALLY ARRANGED SURGICAL INSTRUMENT ARTICULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CMR Surgical Limited 1 Evolution Business Park Milton Road Cambridge CB24 9NG / GB | [2020/40] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states CMR Surgical Limited Unit 2 Crome Lea Business Park Madingley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB23 7PH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARES, Luke David Ronald c/o Cambridge Medical Robotics Limited Unit 2 Crome Lea Business Park Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB23 7PH / GB | 02 /
MARSHALL, Keith c/o Cambridge Medical Robotics Limited Unit 2 Crome Lea Business Park Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB23 7PH / GB | 03 /
PHOOLCHUND, Nikki Priyam Su-Ling c/o Cambridge Medical Robotics Limited Unit 2 Crome Lea Business Park Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB23 7PH / GB | 04 /
CHAPLIN, Ben Robert c/o Cambridge Medical Robotics Limited Unit 2 Crome Lea Business Park Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB23 7PH / GB | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 16813027.6 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016GB53906 | Priority number, date | GB20150021809 | 10.12.2015 Original published format: GB 201521809 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017098279 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3386419 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, B25J9/10 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B17/00234 (CN,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,CN,US);
A61B34/71 (EP,CN,GB,US);
B25J9/1045 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00327 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B2017/2901 (CN,US);
A61B2017/2908 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2932 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2939 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2947 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2034/302 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B2034/305 (EP,CN,GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | SYMMETRISCH ANGEORDNETES GELENK EINES CHIRURGISCHEN INSTRUMENTS | [2018/42] | English: | SYMMETRICALLY ARRANGED SURGICAL INSTRUMENT ARTICULATION | [2018/42] | French: | ARTICULATION D'INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL DISPOSÉE SYMÉTRIQUEMENT | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 26.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014222019 (BRUDNIOK SVEN [DE]); | [X]EP2783643 (LIVSMED INC [KR]); | [X]US2015127045 (PRESTEL STEPHAN [DE]) | International search | [X]US2014222019 (BRUDNIOK SVEN [DE]); | [X]EP2783643 (LIVSMED INC [KR]); | [X]US2015127045 (PRESTEL STEPHAN [DE]) |