EP3391243 - PROMOTED PROPERTIES IN RELATIONAL STRUCTURED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSE, Tittu Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KAPADIA, Arshish Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) OneMicrosoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SEVILMIS, Tarkan Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
OUTCALT, Peter Adam Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
JEANNE, Colin Daniel Eugene Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16813208.2 | 07.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US65220 | Priority number, date | US201562267303P | 15.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562267303 P | US201615181690 | 14.06.2016 Original published format: US201615181690 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017105932 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391243 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
G06F16/278 (EP,US);
G06F16/23 (EP,US);
G06F16/2365 (EP,US);
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06F16/275 (US);
G06Q10/06313 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | GEFÖRDERTE EIGENSCHAFTEN IN RELATIONALEN STRUKTURIERTEN DATEN | [2018/43] | English: | PROMOTED PROPERTIES IN RELATIONAL STRUCTURED DATA | [2018/43] | French: | PROPRIÉTÉS FAVORISÉES DANS DES DONNÉES STRUCTURÉES RELATIONNELLES | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 01.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/31] | 15.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007067354 (MULLENDER MAARTEN W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0058] * * figure 2 *; | [I] - Philipp Frischmuth ET AL, "Linked Data in Enterprise Information Integration", Semantic Web, (20120101), pages 1 - 17, URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/861a/2a0592541ccaf507bc1a31903524d70731cf.pdf, (20170124), XP055338195 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - NG T P ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Propagating updates in a highly replicated database", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. LOS ANGELES, FEB. 5 - 9, 1990; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING], LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE. COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19900205), vol. CONF. 6, doi:10.1109/ICDE.1990.113507, ISBN 978-0-8186-2025-6, pages 529 - 536, XP010018241 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.1990.113507 |