EP3313825 - GLUCOSE UPTAKE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kadmon Corporation, LLC 450 East 29th St. New York, NY 10016 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSZEWSKI, Kellen 176 Scholes Street 1A Brooklyn, NY 11206 / US | 02 /
KIM, Ji-In 260 Gallup Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
POYUROVSKY, Masha 330 E. 38th Street New York, NY 10016 / US | 04 /
LIU, Kevin 7 Greenfield Drive North West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | 05 /
BARSOTTI, Anthony 7 Peter Cooper Road New York, NY 10010 / US | 06 /
MORRIS, Koi 1919 Aspen Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 16815426.8 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39365 | Priority number, date | US201562185223P | 26.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562185223 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016210330 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313825 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D473/34, C07D487/04, C07D491/048, C07D495/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/5377, A61P35/04 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D473/34 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | C07D239/70, A61K31/4155, A61K31/505, C07D231/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | GLUCOSEAUFNAHMEHEMMER | [2018/18] | English: | GLUCOSE UPTAKE INHIBITORS | [2018/18] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'ABSORPTION DU GLUCOSE | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 24.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2018 | 30.06.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012040499 (SURFACE LOGIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* Abstract; paragraphs 2, 25; claims; pages 147, 153, and 156: exanples 191, 215, 242; pages 158-160, table 1: GLUT1 inhibition of examples 191, 215, and 242. * | International search | [A]US2010216789 (NAGARATHNAM DHANAPALAN [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5-13 * entire document *; | [A]US2012238540 (HOLCOMB RYAN C [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5-13* entire document *; | [A]US2012277206 (SHAGINIAN ALEX [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5-13 * entire document *; | [A]US2012329780 (THORMANN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5-13 * entire document * |