EP3314245 - BIOMOLECULAR SENSORS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roswell Biotechnologies, Inc P. O. Box 910657 San Diego, CA 92191 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERRIMAN, Barry, L. P. O. Box 910657 San Diego, CA 92191 / US | 02 /
MOLA, Paul, W. P. O. Box 910657 San Diego, CA 92191 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Justin Scott Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16815467.2 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39446 | Priority number, date | US201562184776P | 25.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562184776 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016210386 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3314245 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N27/327, G01N27/414, C12Q1/6869 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G01N27/4145 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,KR,US);
G01N27/26 (US);
G01N27/327 (US);
G01N27/3272 (KR,US);
G01N27/3276 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2537/157, C12Q2563/116, C12Q2565/133, C12Q2565/607 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | G01N27/26, G01N27/327 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | BIOMOLEKULARE SENSOREN UND VERFAHREN | [2018/18] | English: | BIOMOLECULAR SENSORS AND METHODS | [2018/18] | French: | CAPTEURS BIOMOLÉCULAIRES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 19.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2003064390 (SCHUELEIN JURGEN [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0053] , [0057] * [A] 12,13 [I] 15; | [X]US2004248282 (SOBHA M PISHARODY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,14 * figures 1A-1D * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 13] , [0 70] , [0 76] *; | [XAI]US2014079592 (CHANG CHIA-CHING [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11,14 * figure 15 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0 45] , [0 98] - [0100] * [A] 12,13 [I] 15; | [A] - ROY SOMENATH ET AL, "Mass-Produced Nanogap Sensor Arrays for Ultrasensitive Detection of DNA", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY|, US, vol. 131, no. 34, doi:10.1021/JA901704T, ISSN 0002-7863, (20090902), pages 12211 - 12217, (20090805), XP007918853 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 12213, paragraph last * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja901704t | International search | [A]US2009295372 (KRSTIC PREDRAG S [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 17-22 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US2010184062 (STEINMUELLER-NETHL DORIS [AT], et al) [X] 1-8, 17-20 * ; para [0003], [0008], [0013], [0029], [0035], [0044], [0058], [0076]-[0077], [0083], [0089]-[0091], [0096]; Fig. 1 * [Y] 9, 21-22; | [Y]US2010300899 (LEVINE PETER M [US], et al) [Y] 21-22 * ; para [0007], [0009], [0012]-[0013], [0057] *; | [Y]WO2013096851 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [Y] 9 * ; para [0009], [00174], [00178] *; | [A]US2013331299 (REDA TORSTEN [AT], et al) [A] 1-9, 17-22* ; entire document * |