EP3314655 - MUTILAYER STRUCTURE CONTAINING A CRYSTAL MATCHING LAYER FOR INCREASED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tivra Corporation 3343 B Vincent Road Pleasant Hill, California 94602 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHUCA, Francisco 4159 Midvale Avenue Oakland, California 94602 / US | 02 /
WEISS, Robert 455 Diamond Street San Francisco, California 94114 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 16815516.6 | 27.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39675 | Priority number, date | US201562184692P | 25.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562184692 P | US201562233157P | 25.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562233157 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016210449 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3314655 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/20 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
H01L21/02491 (US);
H01L21/02609 (KR,US);
H01L29/04 (US);
H01L29/1075 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/41758 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/42316 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7786 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7788 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7789 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/0075 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/32 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/64 (KR);
H01L23/36 (EP,US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,US);
H01L33/405 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | 11.01.2018 | ME | 11.01.2018 | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTSTRUKTUR MIT EINER KRISTALLANPASSUNGSSCHICHT ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER LEISTUNG EINES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS | [2018/18] | English: | MUTILAYER STRUCTURE CONTAINING A CRYSTAL MATCHING LAYER FOR INCREASED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE PERFORMANCE | [2018/18] | French: | STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE CONTENANT UNE COUCHE DE MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE DE CRISTAUX POUR DES PERFORMANCES DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ACCRUES | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 11.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYA]US2010176369 (OLIVER MARK [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 10-12, 19 * , Fig 2, abstract, para [0026], [0027] * [Y] 3, 5-9, 13, 15-18 [A] 4, 14; | [Y]US2014191249 (BLANCHARD RICHARD AUSTIN [US], et al) [Y] 3, 13 * , Fig 12, abstract, para [0071], [0076], [0107] *; | [Y]US2013161637 (WERKHOVEN CHRISTIAAN J [US], et al) [Y] 5, 9, 15 * , abstract, para [0043], [0052]-[0055] *; | [Y]US2012119189 (GASKA REMIGIJUS [US], et al) [Y] 6, 16 * , abstract, para [0046] *; | [Y]US2014264396 (LOWENTHAL MARK DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 7, 17 * , abstract, para [0027], [0030] *; | [Y]US2011186874 (SHUM FRANK TIN CHUNG [US]) [Y] 8, 18 * , Fig 1A, abstract, para [0044] *; | [A]US7247889 (HANSON ALLEN W [US], et al) [A] 4, 14 * , abstract, col 1, In 40-47 * |