EP3545335 - RADAR-ASSISTED TRACKING OF MOBILE DEVICES TO IMPROVE THE COMMUNICATION LINK IN HIGH FREQUENCY COMMUNCIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2024/10] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Inc. 4-12-3 Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENGTSSON, Erik Anderssassers v. 17 241 35 Eslöv / SE | 02 /
YING, Zhinong Fanans Gränd 10 226 48 Lund / SE | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2024/10] |
Former [2019/40] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16816046.3 | 22.11.2016 | [2019/40] | WO2016US63352 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018097817 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545335 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3545335 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/10, G01S13/86, G01S7/41, // G01S13/00, G01S13/931, H04W36/32 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
G01S13/10 (EP,US);
G01S13/72 (US);
G01S13/76 (US);
G01S13/86 (EP,US);
G01S7/412 (EP);
H04W36/322 (EP,US);
H04W64/003 (US);
G01S13/003 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9316 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | G01S13/86, G01S13/10, H04W36/32, H04W64/00, G01S13/00, G01S13/93 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADARASSISTIERTES VERFOLGEN VON MOBILGERÄTEN UM DIE VERBINDUNGSQUALITÄT IN EINTER HOCHFREQUENZ KOMMUNIKATION ZU VERBESSERN | [2023/39] | English: | RADAR-ASSISTED TRACKING OF MOBILE DEVICES TO IMPROVE THE COMMUNICATION LINK IN HIGH FREQUENCY COMMUNCIATION | [2019/40] | French: | SUIVI ASSISTÉ PAR RADAR POUR AMELIORER LE LIEN DE COMMUNICATION DANS UNE COMMUNICATION HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | [2023/39] |
Former [2019/40] | RADARGESTÜTZTES VERFOLGUNG VON MOBILEN VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG IN HOCHFREQUENTEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2019/40] | SUIVI ASSISTÉ PAR RADAR DE DISPOSITIFS MOBILES PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LA LIAISON DE COMMUNICATION DANS UNE COMMUNICATION À HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 11.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004063430 (CAVE CHRISTOPHER [CA], et al); | [YA]WO2013089733 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); | [XAYI]EP2861014 (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]); | [YA]US2016165605 (DIMOU KONSTANTINOS D [US], et al); | Examination | US2016041617 |