EP3318663 - SINGLE FIBRE INCLUDING THERMALLY RESPONSIVE LIQUID-CRYSTAL ELASTOMER, FILAMENT YARN, AND FIBRE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO., LTD. 2-2-13 Fujinoki Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0847 / JP | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISEKI, Seiji c/o TOYO TIRE & RUBBER Co., Ltd. 2-2-13 Fujinoki Itami-shi Hyogo 6640847 / JP | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 16817790.5 | 22.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016JP68536 | Priority number, date | JP20150132560 | 01.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015132560 | [2018/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017002682 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3318663 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/70, C08G18/79, C08G18/20 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
D01F6/70 (EP,US);
C08G18/2081 (EP,US);
C08G18/3215 (US);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
D10B2401/046 (US);
D10B2501/06 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | D01F6/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | EINZELFASER MIT WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHEM FLÜSSIGKRISTALLELASTOMER, FILAMENTGARN UND FASERPRODUKT | [2018/19] | English: | SINGLE FIBRE INCLUDING THERMALLY RESPONSIVE LIQUID-CRYSTAL ELASTOMER, FILAMENT YARN, AND FIBRE PRODUCT | [2018/19] | French: | FIBRE UNIQUE COMPRENANT UN ÉLASTOMÈRE THERMOSENSIBLE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, FIL DE FILAMENTS ET PRODUIT FIBREUX | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | Translation filed | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1753901 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,7-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0042] - [0044] * * figure 2 * [A] 2-6; | [XA]WO2010026069 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,7-12 * page 1, lines 5-34 * * page 3, lines 11-15 *[A] 2-6 | International search | [A]JPS6351413 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-12 * , entire text & US 4791187 A & EP 256470 A2 *; | [A]JPH05195322 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-12 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH07292062 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-12 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000281743 (ASAI SHOKUSAN KK) [A] 1-12 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2007247074 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1, 7-12 * , claims; paragraphs [0009], [0012] to [0021]; examples (Family: none) * [Y] 7-12 [A] 2-6; | [XYA]JP2007538168 (Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.) [X] 1, 7, 8, 10, 11 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0008] to [0017], [0065] to [0069] & US 2007/0215836 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001], [0008] to [0017], [0076] to [0080] & WO 2005/113867 A1 & EP 1753901 A1 & KR 10-2007-0013307 A & CN 1954102 A * [Y] 7-12 [A] 2-6; | [A]CN103087296 (UNIV FUDAN) [A] 1-12* , entire text (Family: none) * |