EP3316863 - TARGETED CONJUGATES AND PARTICLES AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tarveda Therapeutics, Inc. 134 Coolidge Avenue Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Brian H. 998 Salem Street Malden, Massachusetts 02148 / US | 02 /
BILODEAU, Mark T. 36 River St. No.323 Waltham, MA 02453 / US | 03 /
MOREAU, Benoît 63 Charlesbank Rd Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US | 04 /
SHINDE, Rajesh R. One Carmel Circle Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 05 /
LIM SOO, Patrick 64 Garfield Place, Unit B Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US | 06 /
SWERYDA-KRAWIEC, Beata 46 Littlefield Lane Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 07 /
BAZINET, Patrick Rosaire 34 Alpine St Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | 08 /
ALARGOVA, Rossitza G. 148 Newton St. Apt.4 Brighton, Massachusetts 02135 / US | 09 /
DUNBAR, Craig A. 24 Shirley Road Needham, Massachusetts 02494 / US | [2018/26] |
Former [2018/23] | 01 /
WHITE, Brian H. 998 Salem Street Malden, Massachusetts 02148 / US | ||
02 /
BILODEAU, Mark T. 277 Border Road Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | |||
03 /
MOREAU, Benoît 63 Charlesbank Rd Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US | |||
04 /
SHINDE, Rajesh R. One Carmel Circle Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | |||
05 /
LIM SOO, Patrick 64 Garfield Place, Unit B Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US | |||
06 /
SWERYDA-KRAWIEC, Beata 46 Littlefield Lane Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | |||
07 /
BAZINET, Patrick Rosaire 34 Alpine St Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | |||
08 /
ALARGOVA, Rossitza G. 148 Newton St. Apt.4 Brighton, Massachusetts 02135 / US | |||
09 /
DUNBAR, Craig A. 24 Shirley Road Needham, Massachusetts 02494 / US | |||
Former [2018/19] | 01 /
WHITE, Brian H. 998 Salem Street Malden, Massachusetts 02148 / US | ||
02 /
BILODEAU, Mark T. 277 Border Road Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | |||
03 /
MOREAU, Benoît 63 Charlesbank Rd Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US | |||
04 /
SHINDE, Rajesh R. 110 Stearns Hill Rd Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
05 /
LIM SOO, Patrick 64 Garfield Place, Unit B Ridgewood, New Jersey 07450 / US | |||
06 /
SWERYDA-KRAWIEC, Beata 46 Littlefield Lane Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | |||
07 /
BAZINET, Patrick Rosaire 34 Alpine St Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | |||
08 /
ALARGOVA, Rossitza G. 148 Newton St. Apt.4 Brighton, Massachusetts 02135 / US | |||
09 /
DUNBAR, Craig A. 24 Shirley Road Needham, Massachusetts 02494 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 16818550.2 | 27.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US39624 | Priority number, date | US201562186657P | 30.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562186657 P | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017003940 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316863 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
A61K47/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5365 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/31 (EP,US);
A61K47/6929 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6937 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | GERICHTETE KONJUGATE SOWIE PARTIKEL UND FORMULIERUNGEN DAVON | [2018/19] | English: | TARGETED CONJUGATES AND PARTICLES AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF | [2018/19] | French: | CONJUGUÉS CIBLÉS, PARTICULES ET PRÉPARATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 28.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005037992 (IMMUNOGEN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15* claim 265 *; | [XPA]WO2016004048 (BLEND THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [XP] 1-4,6-15 * Cpd. 8 (par. 141), cpd. 33 (par. 144), cpd. 66 (par. 147), cpd. 109 (par. 149); par. 007;; claim 12 * [A] 5 | International search | [Y]US4310518 (VEBER DANIEL F [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * Col 3, In 1-10; Col 3,In 31-32; Col 4, In 25-28 *; | [Y]US5820845 (DEAN RICHARD T [US], et al) [Y] 15 * Col 4, In 4-22 *; | [Y]US2004102364 (BONASERA THOMAS A [IT], et al) [Y] 7-9* para [0069];[0072]-[0074] *; | [Y]US2005169933 (STEEVES RITA [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * abstract; para [0002];[0012];[0138];];[0140];[0145];[0146]; [0204] *; | [Y]US2013039848 (BRADBURY MICHELLE [US], et al) [Y] 10-11 * para [0097] *; | [Y]US2014187501 (BILODEAU MARK T [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * para [0011]-[0014];[0020];[0021];[0052];[0077];[0086];[0111];[0200];[0320]; pg 48 * |