EP3316824 - COMPRESSION IMPLANTS AND INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/19] | COMPRESSION IMPLANTS, INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS | ||
[2020/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Ray, LLC 124 South 600 West Suite 100 Logan, UT 84321 / US | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALLIN, T., Wade 124 South 600 West Suite 100 Logan, UT 84321 / US | 02 /
TRIPLETT, Daniel 124 South 600 West Suite 100 Logan, UT 84321 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16818699.7 | 29.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US40118 | Priority number, date | US201562188185P | 02.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562188185 P | US201662308011P | 14.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662308011 P | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017004221 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316824 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/28, A61F2/30 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/17 (EP,US);
A61F2/30724 (US);
A61B17/68 (EP,US);
A61B17/7059 (EP,US);
A61B17/8004 (US);
A61B17/8061 (EP,US);
A61B17/808 (EP,US);
A61B17/809 (EP,US);
A61B17/8095 (EP,US);
A61B17/8872 (EP,US);
A61F2/30749 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2/4465 (EP,US);
A61B17/0642 (EP,US);
A61B17/15 (EP,US);
A61B17/151 (EP,US);
A61B2017/681 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | KOMPRESSIONSIMPLANTATE UND INSTRUMENTE | [2020/10] | English: | COMPRESSION IMPLANTS AND INSTRUMENTS | [2020/10] | French: | IMPLANTS ET INSTRUMENTS DE COMPRESSION | [2020/10] |
Former [2018/19] | KOMPRESSIONSIMPLANTATE, INSTRUMENTE UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2018/19] | COMPRESSION IMPLANTS, INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS | ||
Former [2018/19] | IMPLANTS, INSTRUMENTS ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMPRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 23.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 03.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0064360 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [X]WO2006122194 (CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1* figure 17 *; | [X]WO2010028045 (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 8b *; | [X]US2013123863 (HOLLIS MICHAEL CHAD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * figure 9 *; | [X]US2013144343 (ARNETT JEFFERY D [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 8a *; | [X]US2013267956 (TERRILL LANCE N [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 4 *; | [XA]US2014309639 (AVEROUS CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 8 * [A] 6-8 | International search | [XA]US2008161808 (FOX WILLIAM CASEY [US]) [X] 1 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0071]; claims 1-42; figures 1A-8C. * [A] 2-8; | [A]US8062297 (FAILLACE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2013172889 (TYBER JEFF [US], et al) [A] 1-8* See the whole document. *; | [A]US8585742 (WINDOLF MARKUS [CH]) [A] 1-8 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2014018809 (ALLEN DREW [US]) [A] 1-8 * See the whole document. * |