EP3390077 - TYRE HAVING IMPROVED WEAR PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2018/44] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERVAIS, Philippe Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
GODEAU, Gilles Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 03 /
QUANTINET, Benjamin Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
ZIVKOVIC, Tony Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin DGD/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Le Cam, Stéphane Georges Elie Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16819626.9 | 14.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016FR53376 | Priority number, date | FR20150062469 | 16.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1562469 | [2018/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103432 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390077 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3390077 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/20, B60C11/12, B60C11/03, B60C9/22 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B60C9/2006 (EP);
B60C11/0323 (EP);
B60C11/1281 (EP);
B60C9/22 (EP);
B60C2200/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT VERBESSERTEN ABNUTZUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2018/43] | English: | TYRE HAVING IMPROVED WEAR PROPERTIES | [2018/43] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE PRESENTANT DES PROPRIETES D'USURE AMELIOREES | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2016 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | IT | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | GB | 14.12.2020 | IE | 14.12.2020 | LU | 14.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 14.12.2016 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.12.2016 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 14.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
GB | 14.12.2020 | ||
IE | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 14.12.2020 | ||
LU | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010030276 (MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-7; claims 1-30 *; | [Y]FR2950565 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0065] , [0081] , [0086] , [0093] - [0098]; figures 1-4,6,11; claims 1-16 *; | [Y]WO2013053877 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0133]; figures 1,2; claims 1-17 *; | [Y]WO2014102136 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13* figures 1-3; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]FR3014022 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0037] , [0043]; figures 1,2a-2d; claims 1-6 * |