EP3471688 - SYNERGISTIC HAIR CARE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | For all designated states Dow Brasil Sudeste Industrial Ltda. Av. das Nações Unidas, 14.171, 4 Floor Part Diamond Tower, Santo Amaro 04794-000 São Paulo SP / BR | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies, LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE FATIMA SCARPARO DE SANCTIS, Daisy Av das Nacoes Unidas 14171 Santo Amaro 04794-000 Sao Paulo / BR | 02 /
FERNANDES, Nikhil J. 400 Arcola Road Collegeville PA 19426 / US | 03 /
MALOTKY, David L. 1714 Building Washington Street Midland MI 48674 / US | 04 /
THOMAS, Jodi A. 1501 Larkin Center Drive 200 Larkin Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 16820389.1 | 30.11.2016 | [2019/17] | WO2016US64096 | Priority number, date | US201662350356P | 15.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662350356 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017218035 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471688 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61K8/31, A61K8/41, A61K8/81, A61K8/86, A61K8/891, A61K8/898, A61Q5/12, B01F3/08 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61K8/898 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/48 (US);
A61K2800/596 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE HAARPFLEGEFORMULIERUNGEN | [2019/17] | English: | SYNERGISTIC HAIR CARE FORMULATIONS | [2019/17] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE SOIN CAPILLAIRE SYNERGIQUES | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 10.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5539021 (PATE JAMES E [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,4-10* column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 27 *; | [Y]WO2015138210 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * example - * * page 6, line 2 - line 6 * | by applicant | US4701432 | US5272236 | US5322728 | US5539021 | US6525157 | US6783766 | US6960635 | - J. P. SIBILIA, A Guide to Materials Characterization and Chemical Analysis, VCH, (1988), pages 81 - 84 |