EP3319800 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THREE DIMENSIONAL PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Something3d Ltd. 4 Hashiloah Street P.O.B. 7227 4934829 Petah Tikva / IL | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSKAS, Dotan 61 Yehuda Halevi Street 54024 Givat Shmuel / IL | 02 /
MOLCHO, Itzhak 27 Gedaliahu Street 3258725 Haifa / IL | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16820957.5 | 07.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016IL50725 | Priority number, date | US201562190377P | 09.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562190377 P | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017006324 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319800 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 12.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y30/00, B33Y10/00, B29C67/00, B29C64/209, B29C64/393, B29C64/118 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A23G1/202 (EP,US);
A23G1/0056 (US);
B21C23/14 (US);
B29C48/02 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/17 (EP,US);
B29C48/266 (EP,US);
B29C48/2886 (EP,US);
B29C48/304 (EP,US);
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
B29C48/865 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP);
B29C64/118 (EP,US);
B29C64/209 (EP,US);
B29C64/295 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | B33Y30/00, B33Y10/00, B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DREIDIMENSIONALEN DRUCKEN | [2018/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THREE DIMENSIONAL PRINTING | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 03.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2014034214 (BOYER HUGO [US], et al) [X] 7,8,10,13 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-27; claims 1-6 * [Y] 1-5 [I] 9,11,12,15; | [YA]CN104552955 (QINGDAO UNIQUE PRODUCTS DEVELOP CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *[A] 6-15 | International search | [XY]US2014277661 (AMADIO LOUIS [US], et al) [X] 10-14 * ¶0058-0059, 0069-0072, step 804, 808, 810, 812 fig.8 ¶ 0059, 0069-0072, 804,810,812 fig. 8 * [Y] 9, 20; | [XY]CN104552955 (QINGDAO UNIQUE PRODUCTS DEVELOP CO LTD) [X] 1-8, 15-19 * 'heater 3' , 'nozzle 4', 'feeder 1 and 2', 'tunnel 31' fig. 2, 4, 'color switch' 30 ¶ 30 * [Y] 9, 20; | [A]CN204322531U (HUNAN RUIDU TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-8, 15-19 * Whole document *; | [PA]CN204488055U (ISUN3D TECH SHNZHEN CO LTD) [PA] 1-8, 15-19* Abstract *; | [A] - ABILGAZIYEV, A. et al., "Design and development of multi-nozzle extrusion system for 3D printer.", In Informatics, Electronics & Vision (ICIEV), 2015 International Conference on, (20150615), pages 1 - 5, XP032815571 [A] 1-8, 15-19 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIEV.2015.7333982 |