EP3322006 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NEGATIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR NON-AQUEOUS-ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR NON-AQUEOUS-ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL, AND NON-AQUEOUS-ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMO, Hiromichi c/o Silicone Electronics Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1-10 Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 02 /
HIROSE, Takakazu c/o Silicone Electronics Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1-10 Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/20] | 01 /
KAMO, Hiromichi c/o Silicone Electronics Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1-10 Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | ||
02 /
HIROSE, Takakazu c/o Silicone Electronics Materials Research Center SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1-10 Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16821036.7 | 05.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016JP03197 | Priority number, date | JP20150135800 | 07.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015135800 | JP20150256947 | 28.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015256947 | [2018/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017006561 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3322006 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3322006 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/48, H01M4/13, H01M4/139 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H01M4/485 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/325 (KR);
H01M4/48 (CN,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M10/0587 (US);
H01M4/0459 (KR);
H01M4/0497 (EP);
H01M4/13 (US);
H01M4/131 (EP,KR);
H01M4/139 (CN,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/1395 (US);
H01M4/36 (CN);
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/483 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP);
H01M4/625 (CN);
C01P2006/40 (KR);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (US);
H01M2300/0025 (EP);
H01M4/0428 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NEGATIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIALS FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRZELLE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES NEGATIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIALS FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRZELLE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT, ELEKTRODE FÜR DIE SEKUNDÄRZELLE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT UND SEKUNDÄRZELLE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2018/20] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NEGATIVE-ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR NON-AQUEOUS-ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR NON-AQUEOUS-ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL, AND NON-AQUEOUS-ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UN MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR UNE PILE RECHARGEABLE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UNE ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR UNE PILE RECHARGEABLE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX ET PILE RECHARGEABLE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2018 | Translation filed | 05.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 05.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2016 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | IE | 05.07.2020 | LU | 05.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.07.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005118083 (TABUCHI TORU [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-13 * claims 1-16 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018] *[I] 6,9 | International search | [Y]JPH11283670 (HITACHI MAXELL) [Y] 9, 11-12 * , paragraphs [0036] to [0038] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000195505 (TOKUYAMA CORP) [Y] 4, 13 * , claims 1, 2; paragraphs [0011] to [0015], [0039] to [0049] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005108826 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-13* , claims 1 to 6 & US 2005/0118083 A1 claims 1 to 7 & CN 1591936 A *; | [XY]JP2005235589 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 7-8, 10 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0017], [0033] to [0041], [0069] to [0115] (Family: none) * [Y] 4, 9, 11-13; | [XY]JP2005235439 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1-8, 10, 13 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0023], [0043] to [0098] (Family: none) * [Y] 4, 9, 11-13; | [A]WO2013146569 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * , claims 1 to 10; paragraphs [0047] to [0058] & US 2015/0072220 A1 claims 1 to 10; paragraphs [0056] to [0069] * |