EP3321055 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL, AND FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Kazuhisa c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
KAKIMOTO, Yoshihide c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
HIRAKAWA, Daiki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
IKEDA Kazuhisa c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | ||
02 /
KAKIMOTO Yoshihide c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | |||
03 /
HIRAKAWA Daiki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | |||
Former [2018/20] | 01 /
IKEDA Kazuhisa c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8253 / JP | ||
02 /
KAKIMOTO Yoshihide c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8253 / JP | |||
03 /
HIRAKAWA Daiki c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8253 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16821480.7 | 08.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016JP70250 | Priority number, date | JP20150136824 | 08.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015136824 | [2018/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017007012 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321055 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/46, B29B11/16, B29C70/08, B29C70/20, B29C70/22, // B29K105/08 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
B29C70/207 (EP,US);
B29C70/22 (KR);
B29B11/12 (KR);
B29B11/16 (EP,KR,US);
B29C43/203 (KR);
B29C70/086 (EP,US);
B29C70/222 (EP,US);
B29C70/228 (EP,US);
B29C70/30 (KR);
B29C70/46 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B5/12 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
C08J5/24 (KR);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | B29C43/02, B29B11/12, B29C43/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FASERVERSTÄRKTEN VERBUNDWERKSTOFFS SOWIE FASERVERSTÄRKTER VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2018/20] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL, AND FIBER-REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES, ET MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2017 | Translation filed | 22.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 22.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/17] | Divisional application(s) | EP20160917.9 / EP3698952 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2820359 (DUQUEINE VINCENT [FR]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 2, line 32 - line 36 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 6 * [I] 2,6; | [X]WO2010097547 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 10 * * page 10, line 9 - line 12 * * claim 1 * * figure 10 *; | [X]US2011064908 (KWEDER MATTHEW [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1,2,3,5,6,8,9 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0024] , [0035] *; | [XI]WO2014038710 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 6 * [I] 6; | [XI]WO2014069503 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 6; | [P]EP2894019 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0029] , [0032] , [0034] , [0052] , [0053] , [0054] *; | [P]EP2915645 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0012] , [0046] , [0050] *; | [T] - Flake C. Campbell, "Laminates", MANUFACTURING PROCESSES FOR ADVANCED COMPOSITES, GB, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, OXFORD, (20040101), page 3,5, ISBN 978-1-85617-415-2, XP055459169 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [XY]JPH03166914 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al) [X] 1, 2, 9 * , page 3, upper right column to lower left column (Family: none) * [Y] 16, 17, 19; | [XY]JPH04251715 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0003] to [0013]; fig. 2 to 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 16, 17, 19; | [XY]JP2007168272 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1, 2, 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0033] to [0036] (Family: none) * [Y] 16, 17, 19; | [Y]JP2011093253 (UNIV KANAZAWA, et al) [Y] 16, 17, 19 * , claims; paragraphs [0071] to [0094] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2014051077 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1, 2, 9, 12 * , paragraphs [0001], [0025] to [0028] (Family: none) * [Y] 16, 17, 19; | [A]JP2014208457 (FUKUI PREFECTURE) [A] 1-21* , entire text & US 2016/0039185 A & WO 2014/156836 A1 & EP 2979856 A * |