EP3321165 - SHIP-COLLISION AVOIDANCE GUIDING SYSTEM USING TIME SERIES GRAPHIC DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute Of Ocean Science & Technology 787, Haean-ro Sangnok-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 15627 / KR | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jin Hyoung (Yongsan-dong Gyeongnam Ahneoseubil 2Danji) 205dong 602ho 133 Baeul2-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34034 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hong Tae (Areum-dong Beomjigi Maeul 10Danji) 1013dong 703ho 211 Dalbit-ro Sejong 30100 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Han Jin (Hanwool Apt.) 108-1104 43 Gajung-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34118 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Deuk Jae (Jijokdong Noeun Ggume Green 1Danji) 105dong-1403ho 33 Jijokbuk-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34070 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Jin Ki 203 471-10 Sangdae-dong yuseong-gu Daejeon 34199 / KR | 06 /
JANG, Jun Hyuk (Doandong 13Blocks Geumseong Baekjo Yemizi Apt.) 106-1401 125 Doanbuk-ro, Seo-gu Daejeon 35350 / KR | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16821627.3 | 05.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016KR07270 | Priority number, date | KR20150096634 | 07.07.2015 Original published format: KR 20150096634 | [2018/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017007221 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321165 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B63B49/00, G08G3/00, G08G3/02 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
G08G3/02 (EP,US);
B63B45/00 (EP,US);
B63B49/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | LEITSYSTEM ZUR KOLLISIONSVERMEIDUNG VON SCHIFFEN MIT GRAFSCHER ZEITREIHENANZEIGE | [2018/20] | English: | SHIP-COLLISION AVOIDANCE GUIDING SYSTEM USING TIME SERIES GRAPHIC DISPLAY | [2018/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE D'ÉVITEMENT DE COLLISION DE NAVIRE UTILISANT UN AFFICHAGE GRAPHIQUE CHRONOLOGIQUE | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2018 | Translation filed | 23.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 23.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]KR101193081B (CHEJU NAT UNIV IND ACAD COOP [KR]) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0123]-[0126], [0135]-[0136] and figure 13. *; | [Y]JP3134974U (OKAZAKI, Tsuyoshi) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0024], [0027]-[0028] and Figures 2-3. *; | [Y]KR20110114078 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 9-12 * See abstract and claim 1. *; | [A]KR101275277B (KOREA INST OCEAN SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-12 * . See paragraphs [0049]-[0050] and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20150050766 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0026] and 1. * |