EP3383552 - PAINTING BOOTH WITH OVERSPRAY REMOVAL SYSTEM, METHOD FOR REMOVING THE OVERSPRAY, AND PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geico SPA Via Pelizza da Volpedo, 109/111 20092 Cinisello Balsamo (MI) / IT | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGLIO, Valerio Viale Vittorio Veneto 21 20900 Monza (MB) / IT | 02 /
DI LUCREZIA, Alessandro c/o GEICO SPA Via Pelizza da Volpedo 109/111 20092 Cinisello Balsamo (MI) / IT | [2020/24] |
Former [2018/41] | 01 /
IGLIO, Valerio Viale Vittorio Veneto 21 I-20900 Monza (MB) / IT | ||
02 /
DI LUCREZIA, Alessandro c/o GEICO SPA Via Pelizza da Volpedo 109/111 I-20092 Cinisello Balsamo (MI) / IT | Representative(s) | Lampis, Marco, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16822536.5 | 28.11.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016IB57150 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB06098 | 02.12.2015 Original published format: IT UB20156098 | [2018/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017093874 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3383552 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3383552 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/00 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
B05B16/60 (EP,US);
B05B14/43 (EP,KR,US);
B05B14/468 (US);
B01D41/02 (EP,US);
B01D46/30 (US);
B01D46/32 (EP,KR,US);
B05B14/46 (KR);
B05B16/00 (US);
B05B7/1454 (US);
B05C15/00 (US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B05D7/14 (US);
B09B3/00 (US);
B01D2258/0258 (EP,US);
B01D2275/204 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | B05B15/12, B01D46/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | 04.05.2018 | ME | 04.05.2018 | Validation states | MA | 04.05.2018 | MD | 04.05.2018 | Title | German: | LACKIERKABINE MIT OVERSPRAYABSCHEIDUNGSVORRICHTUNG, OVERSPRAYABSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN UND SOLCHER ANLAGE | [2020/02] | English: | PAINTING BOOTH WITH OVERSPRAY REMOVAL SYSTEM, METHOD FOR REMOVING THE OVERSPRAY, AND PLANT | [2018/41] | French: | CABINE DE PEINTURE AVEC SÉPARATION DU SURPLUS PUOLVÉRISÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DU SURPLUS ET INSTALLATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2020/02] |
Former [2018/41] | LACKIERKABINE VON OVERSPRAYBESEITIGUNGSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON OVERSPRAY UND ANLAGE | ||
Former [2018/41] | CABINE DE PEINTURE À SYSTÈME D'ÉLIMINATION D'EXCÈS DE PROJECTION, PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ÉLIMINATION DE L'EXCÈS DE PROJECTION ET INSTALLATION | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2021
12.03.2021
ADMISSIBLE Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Strasse 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2021
12.03.2021
ADMISSIBLE Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Strasse 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2022/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2021
12.03.2021
ADMISSIBLE Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Strasse 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2021/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2021
Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Strasse 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | 24.03.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.08.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2022 | 25.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.02.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2016 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | IE | 28.11.2020 | LU | 28.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | ES | 29.11.2022 | SI | 29.11.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/37] | HU | 28.11.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
BE | 30.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
SI | 29.11.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | HU | 28.11.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
BE | 30.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/32] | HU | 28.11.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.11.2016 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 28.11.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 28.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2094304 (TUNZINI AMELIORAIR SA) [X] 1-3,5,7 * page 5, lines 15-16 - page 2, line 1; claims 3,9,11 * [I] 11,13-15; | [A]CH679644 (MBF AIR TEC AG) [A] 7,8 * column 1, lines 10-14; claims 1,6,10 *; | [A]US2007166463 (KELLY CRAIG J [US]) [A] 1,9,10* figures 1,62,; claims 2,6,8,14 *; | [YA]DE102007041008 (EISENMANN ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 11,12,15,16 * paragraphs [0042] , [ 047]; figures 2,3; claims 1,3, * [A] 1-3,7-10,13,14; | [XY]US2013122188 (FRITZ HANS-GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10,13 * paragraphs [0425] , [0575]; figures 3,9,21-24,29-33; claim 24 * [Y] 11,12,15,16; | [X]US2014134339 (HOLLER SEBASTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10,13 * figures 1,8; claims 9,10,15,17 *; | [X]DE102013011107 (EISENMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-16 * Fig. 4: left side; paragraphs [0023] , [035.036] , [0071] , [0072] , [ 079] , [0080] , [0082]; figure 4; claims 2,9 * | Opposition | FR2094304 | US4684378 | CH679644 | DE19938772 | US2007166463 | JP2009028587 | DE102007040901 | DE102007041008 | DE102007040896 | JP2009125647 | JP2009125646 | WO2013013846 | WO2013013847 | WO2013013848 | US2013122188 | US2014134339 | DE102013011107 |