EP3560183 - CALL COLLISION RESOLUTION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 1 20123 Milano / IT | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUSCO, Antonio TELECOM ITALIA S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli 274 10148 Torino / IT | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 16822683.5 | 23.12.2016 | [2019/44] | WO2016EP82549 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018113992 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560183 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560183 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M3/56, H04M7/00 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
H04M3/42 (EP);
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (US);
H04L65/1104 (US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M2201/22 (EP);
H04M2203/5063 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFRUFKOLLISIONSAUFLÖSUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2019/44] | English: | CALL COLLISION RESOLUTION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2019/44] | French: | RÉSOLUTION DE COLLISION D'APPEL DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US8582745 (CHITNIS SIDDHARTH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 67 * * column 8, line 33 - column 9, line 55 ** figures 1a,1b,2,5a,5b *; | [AD]CN105207973 (BEIJING XINWEI TELECOM TECH CO, et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * |