EP3377246 - GUIDING UNIT FOR SLABS IN A CONTINUOUS CASTING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danieli & C. Officine Meccaniche S.p.A. Via Nazionale 41 33042 Buttrio / IT | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARNELUTTI, Guido Via della Bressana 1 33010 Pagnacco / IT | 02 /
VECCHIET, Fabio Via dei Pruni 40 33052 Cervignano del Friuli / IT | 03 /
FABBRO, Pierluigi Via Madoles 14 33030 S. Vito di Fagagna / IT | 04 /
PUZZO, Stefano Via Gaetano Perusini 11B 33040 Premariacco / IT | 05 /
CONTE, Riccardo Via Gabriele D'Annunzio 64 34077 Ronchi dei Legionari / IT | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Celona, Antonio, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2020/37] |
Former [2018/39] | Celona, Antonio, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16823326.0 | 21.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016IB56996 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB05789 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: IT UB20155789 | [2018/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017085699 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377246 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3377246 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/124, F27B9/24, F27D3/00, B21B27/08, B22D11/128, C03B35/18 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B22D11/1287 (EP,US);
B22D11/124 (EP,US);
F27B9/2407 (EP,US);
F27D3/0024 (EP,US);
F27D2003/0042 (EP,US);
F27D2003/0067 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | B22D11/128, C03B35/18, B21B27/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSEINHEIT FÜR BRAMMEN IN EINER STRANGGIESSANLAGE | [2018/39] | English: | GUIDING UNIT FOR SLABS IN A CONTINUOUS CASTING PLANT | [2018/39] | French: | UNITÉ DE GUIDAGE DE DALLES DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE COULÉE CONTINUE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 19.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2016 | AL | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | IE | 21.11.2020 | LU | 21.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 21.11.2016 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 21.11.2016 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2240608 (COOPER ROLLER BEARINGS COMPANY [GB]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]US2003136543 (EISENMANN LEO [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015]; figure 1 * | Examination | US2012043047 | EP2682203 |