EP3321821 - BIG DATA EXCHANGE METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Dong c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16823745.1 | 06.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016CN84954 | Priority number, date | CN201510405965 | 10.07.2015 Original published format: CN201510405965 | [2018/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017008598 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321821 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3321821 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/23, G06F16/25 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G06F16/254 (EP,US);
G06F16/00 (US);
G06F16/23 (EP,US);
G06F16/901 (CN);
H04L67/10 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTAUSCH GROSSER DATEN | [2018/20] | English: | BIG DATA EXCHANGE METHOD AND DEVICE | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANGE DE DONNÉES MASSIVES | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2017 | Translation filed | 05.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 05.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2016 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | MT | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015074165 (RAHARDJA DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract; paragraphs [0024] - [0045]; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5-10; | [A]US2011087714 (HE YI [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] *; | [A]US2008255974 (JACOB SANJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [X]CN103731298 (706 INST 2ND RES INST CHINA AEROSPACE SCIENCE & INDUSTRY CORP, et al) [X] 1-10 * , see description, paragraphs [0095]-[0105], and figures 2 and 4 *; | [X]CN104699855 (CHENGDU CALABAR INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0003] and [0006] *; | [A]CN102546730 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102081656 (JIANGSU MENGLAN SHENCAI TECHNOLOGY DEV CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document * |