EP3323925 - MAGNETIC VARIABLE-DAMPING VIBRATION-REDUCING CONTROL METHOD FOR WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Drum Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Haier Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LV, Yanfen No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
XU, Sheng No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Qing No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | 04 /
PENG, Xiuwen No.1 Haier Road Hi-tech Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16823874.9 | 12.07.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016CN89730 | Priority number, date | CN201510413023 | 14.07.2015 Original published format: CN201510413023 | [2018/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017008727 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323925 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3323925 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/20, F16F9/53, D06F33/02, D06F37/22, D06F37/24 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
D06F33/48 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/22 (EP,KR,US);
F16F9/53 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/24 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/26 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | D06F37/20, F16F9/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSREDUZIERENDES STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN MIT MAGNETISCHER VARIABLER DÄMPFUNG FÜR WASCHMASCHINE | [2018/21] | English: | MAGNETIC VARIABLE-DAMPING VIBRATION-REDUCING CONTROL METHOD FOR WASHING MACHINE | [2018/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE RÉDUCTION DE VIBRATION À AMORTISSEMENT VARIABLE MAGNÉTIQUE DESTINÉ À UNE MACHINE À LAVER | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2018 | Translation filed | 05.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 04.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2016 | AL | 01.01.2020 | AT | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | ES | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | NL | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | IE | 12.07.2020 | LU | 12.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 12.07.2016 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.07.2016 | |
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 01.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0878574 (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOME [IT]) [A] 1-13 * column 6, line 14 - column 7, line 17 *; | [A]EP1564434 (BRANDT IND SAS [FR]) [A] 1-13* figure -; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO2007009341 (UNIV HONG KONG POLYTECHNIC [CN], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 23 *; | [A]CN102162499 (HAIER GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH04371193 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-13* , the whole document *; | [A]EP0878574 (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOME [IT]) [A] 1-13 * , description, column 7, line 18 to column 8, line 2 *; | [A]CN2725625Y (BEIJING POLYTECHNIC COLLEGE [CN]) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102162499 (HAIER GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document * |