EP3321391 - CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION DEVICE AND CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2019/32] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATSUOKA Sho c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI Kenji c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Central Research Institute 1002-14 Mukohyama Naka-shi Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16824406.9 | 08.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016JP70292 | Priority number, date | JP20150138721 | 10.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015138721 | JP20160135275 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016135275 | [2018/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017010426 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321391 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, B23B27/14 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
C23C16/34 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45589 (KR);
C23C16/455 (US);
C23C16/45574 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45576 (EP,US);
C23C16/45578 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR CHEMISCHEN DAMPFPHASENABSCHEIDUNG | [2018/20] | English: | CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION DEVICE AND CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION METHOD | [2018/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉPÔT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2018 | Translation filed | 05.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 05.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012103260 (PARK SANG JOON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0056] *; | [Y]JP2012533876 [Y] 1-10* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]JP2014129562 (SUMITOMO ELEC HARDMETAL CORP) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0065] *; | [X]EP2869334 (TGO TECH CORP [KR]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]JP2015124407 (SUMITOMO ELEC HARDMETAL CORP) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0098]; table 5 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0100]; figures 1-3 *; | [YP]US2015345013 (PASEUTH ANONGSACK [JP], et al) [YP] 1-10 * paragraph [0065] * | International search | [Y]JP2012533876 (Wonik IPS Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0047] & US 2012/0103260 A1 paragraphs [0023] to [0056] & WO 2011/007967 A2 & KR 10-2011-0007434 A & TW 201115673 A & CN 102576669 A *; | [Y]JPH08250429 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0029] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014129562 (SUMITOMO ELEC HARDMETAL CORP) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0095] & US 2015/0345013 A1 paragraphs [0017] to [0136] & WO 2014/103533 A1 & EP 2940181 A1 & CN 104870685 A & KR 10-2015-0101448 A * |