EP3319571 - MICROPOROUS BREATHABLE FILM AND METHOD OF MAKING THE MICROPOROUS BREATHABLE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berry Global, Inc. 101 Oakley Street Evansville, Indiana 47710 / US | [2018/52] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Berry Plastics Corporation 101 Oakley Street Evansville, IN 47710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIDDLESWORTH, Jeffrey Alan 116 West Maple Avenue Wauconda, Illinois 60084 / US | 02 /
KITZMILLER, Brooke D. P. O. Box 2947 North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US | 03 /
SONNENTAG, Bradley 30839 50th Avenue Boyd, Wisconsin 54726 / US | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 16824959.7 | 08.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016US41617 | Priority number, date | US201562191010P | 10.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562191010 P | US201562233128P | 25.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562233128 P | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017011341 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319571 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/49, A61F13/511, A61F13/514, B32B5/18, B32B7/12, B32B27/20, B29C55/18 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
B29C48/0018 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61F13/49006 (IL,KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61F13/51121 (IL,KR);
A61F13/513 (IL,KR);
B29C48/022 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C48/917 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C55/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C55/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C55/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29C67/20 (KR);
B29C71/02 (KR);
C08K3/00 (KR);
A61F2013/51147 (IL,KR);
A61F2013/51178 (IL,KR);
B29C2071/022 (KR);
B29K2023/00 (KR);
B29K2023/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29K2105/041 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29K2105/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29K2503/04 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | A61F13/15, A61F13/49, A61F13/511, A61F13/514, B32B5/18, B32B7/12, B32B27/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | MIKROPORÖSER ATMUNGSAKTIVER FILM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES MIKROPORÖSEN ATMUNGSAKTIVEN FILMS | [2018/20] | English: | MICROPOROUS BREATHABLE FILM AND METHOD OF MAKING THE MICROPOROUS BREATHABLE FILM | [2018/20] | French: | FILM MICROPOREUX PERMÉABLE À L'AIR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT FILM MICROPOREUX PERMÉABLE À L'AIR | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 08.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4704238 (OKUYAMA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * figure 1; example 1; claims 1,3-8,12 *; | [X]EP0283200 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11-14 * examples 1-4 *; | [X]WO0151548 (CLOPAY PLASTIC PROD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * claims 1,5,8,13 *; | [X]US6676871 (BENASSI GUY [BE], et al) [X] 1,14* column 13; figure 1; example 1 *; | [X]WO2005110713 (CLOPAY PLASTIC PROD CO [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15 * page 13 - page 16; example 1; claims 1,11,27,36, *; | [X]WO2009094506 (CLOPAY PLASTIC PROD CO [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14,15 * page 12, paragraph 1; claim 50 * | International search | [X]US6479154 (WALTON GLYNIS ALLICIA [US], et al) [X] 1 * ; column 4, lines 25-29; column 9, lines 24-27, 62-67; column 10, lines 1-4; column 12, lines 36-40, 60-67; column 13, lines 10-12, 29-32, 62-65 *; | [X]US2004170852 (GUSTAFSON BO [SE]) [X] 1-15, 18-20 * ; entire document, in particular paragraphs [0069]-[0071], [0084]-[0087], [0094] [0135], [0142]-[0144]; claims 39-42 *; | [X]WO2005021262 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [X] 1, 16, 21-23, 54, 56-60 17, 50-53, 55 * ; entire document, in particular page 5, lines 5-15; page 9, lines 5-7; page 10, lines 13-19; page 13, lines 4-5; page 24, lines 2-29; page 25, lines 1-8, 23-24; page 28, lines 8-24; page 31, lines 10-11; page 33, lines 9-14; claims 1, 12, 14-16; figures 7-8 *; | [Y]US2011039083 (CHEN YUHMING [US], et al) [Y] 50-53, 55* ; paragraphs [0015],[0018]-[0019], [0035], [0037]-[0038] *; | [Y]US2013210621 (TOPOLKARAEV VASILY A [US], et al) [Y] 17 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0075]-[0076] * | by applicant | US2699457 | US2862917 | US2905645 | US3058963 | US4668752 | US4704238 | US4739012 | EP0283200 | US4868062 | US5399426 | WO0151548 | US6265055 | US6479154 | US6656581 | US6676871 | US2004170852 | WO2005021262 | WO2005110713 | WO2009094506 | WO2011019504 | US9174420 | - The Wiley Encyclopedia of Packaging Technology, (19970000), pages 233 - 238 | - Kirk-Othmer Concise Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, (19990000), pages 1420 - 1421 | - "Development of New Ionomers with Novel Gas Permeation Properties", Journal of Plastic Film and Sheeting, (20070000), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 119 - 132 |