EP3387594 - METHOD FOR MANAGING A GROUP OF ELECTRIC POWER CONSUMING DEVICES, AND ELECTRIC POWER MANAGEMENT MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electricité de France 22-30 Avenue de Wagram 75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states Institut Mines Telecom Etablissement Telecom Paristech 37 Rue Dareau 75014 Paris / FR | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUSSELLE, Mélaine 28 avenue Raymond Aaron 91300 Massy / FR | 02 /
FORESTIER, Philippe 138 rue Lasègue 92320 Chatillon / FR | 03 /
AL ZAHR, Sawsan 46 rue de l'Amiral Mouchez 75014 Paris / FR | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16825458.9 | 06.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016FR53230 | Priority number, date | FR20150062001 | 08.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1562001 | [2018/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017098137 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387594 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, H02J3/14 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
B60L53/64 (EP,US);
B60L53/665 (EP,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
H02J2203/20 (US);
H02J2310/14 (EP,US);
H02J3/003 (US);
Y02B70/30 (EP,US);
Y02B70/3225 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER GRUPPE VON STROMVERBRAUCHENDEN VORRICHTUNGEN UND STROMVERWALTUNGSMODUL | [2018/42] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING A GROUP OF ELECTRIC POWER CONSUMING DEVICES, AND ELECTRIC POWER MANAGEMENT MODULE | [2018/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE GESTION D'UN ENSEMBLE D'APPAREILS CONSOMMATEURS D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE, ET MODULE GESTIONNAIRE D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 29.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/21] | 20.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]FR2672400 (EURO CP SARL [FR]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [I]US2012101652 (SHIN JONG HYUN [KR], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0084] * * sentence 182 - sentence 223 * * figures 1,7,8 *; | [I]US2012166004 (PARK WAN KI [KR], et al) [I] 1-16* the whole document * |