EP3405229 - NEEDLE INSERTION AND RETRACTION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states West Pharma. Services IL, Ltd. 4 Hasheizaf Street 4366411 Ra'anana / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | For all designated states West Pharma. Services IL, Ltd 4 Hasheizaf Street 4366411 Ra'anana / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABIRI, Oz 775 Nahal Natof Street 71799 Macabim-Reut / IL | 02 /
HEZKIAHU, Ran Id-039030465 Komemiut 6 4668346 Herzliya / IL | 03 /
HAMMER, Tal Hazon-ish 129/8 Ramat-gan / IL | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 16825678.2 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/48] | WO2016US68367 | Priority number, date | US201662281536P | 21.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662281536 P | WO2016US56223 | 10.10.2016 Original published format: PCT/US2016/056223 | WO2016US56238 | 10.10.2016 Original published format: PCT/US2016/056238 | WO2016US56247 | 10.10.2016 Original published format: PCT/US2016/056247 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017127215 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405229 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/20 (CN,US);
A61M5/1413 (EP,US);
A61M5/31 (CN);
A61M5/31533 (CN);
A61M5/31545 (CN);
A61M5/31583 (CN);
A61M2005/14252 (US);
A61M2005/14256 (US);
A61M2005/1585 (US);
A61M2005/2006 (CN);
A61M2005/2026 (CN);
A61M2005/206 (US);
A61M2005/244 (US);
A61M2005/2492 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | NADELEINFÜHR- UND RETRAKTIONSMECHANISMUS | [2018/48] | English: | NEEDLE INSERTION AND RETRACTION MECHANISM | [2018/48] | French: | MÉCANISME D'INTRODUCTION ET DE RÉTRACTION D'AIGUILLE | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 31.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US9149575 (CABIRI OZ [IL]) [XD] 1-6,10,13-20 * column 2, lines 43-50 * * column 4, lines 7-45 * * column 4, line 56 - line 65 * * column 5, line 29 - line 60 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 2 * * figures 1-10, 12, 17A, 17B *[I] 7-9,11,12 | by applicant | US5858001 | US6189292 | US6500150 | US6824529 | US6843782 | US2009093792 | US7530964 | US7967795 | US2013253434 | US8603028 | US2014163526 | US2014194854 | US8915882 | US9149575 |