EP3411746 - SUPER-RESOLUTION VIRTUAL REALITY HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAYS AND METHODS OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUBERT, Martin Friedrich GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | 02 /
SPITZER, Mark Bradley GOOGLE INC. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16826558.5 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/50] | WO2016US68048 | Priority number, date | US201615014622 | 03.02.2016 Original published format: US201615014622 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017136062 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411746 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G06T3/40 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
G09G3/007 (EP);
G06T19/006 (US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G06T3/4053 (EP,US);
G06T3/4076 (US);
G02B2027/0134 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Title | German: | HOCHAUFLÖSENDE KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGEN FÜR VIRTUELLE REALITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2018/50] | English: | SUPER-RESOLUTION VIRTUAL REALITY HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAYS AND METHODS OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2018/50] | French: | VISIOCASQUES DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE À SUPER-RÉSOLUTION ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 27.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2012105582 (YOUN JEONGNAM [KR], et al) [I] 1-18 * figures 1-7; claims 1-5 *; | [I]US2014267286 (DUPARRE JACQUES [DE]) [I] 1-18* paragraph [0024]; claims 22,23 * |