EP3397232 - BALANCE FUNCTIONING DENTURE TOOTH SYSTEMS CONTAINING TOUGHENED COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentsply Sirona Inc. 221 W. Philadelphia Street Suite 60W York, PA 17401 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jiemin, Benjamin 3130 Wheatlyn Road York PA 17402 / US | 02 /
AMMON, Dan 174P Dew Drop Road York PA 17402 / US | 03 /
FRITSCH, Brian 3835 Sterling Way Columbia PA 17512 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16826634.4 | 28.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016US68799 | Priority number, date | US201562271832P | 28.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562271832 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017117175 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397232 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083, A61C13/00 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
A61C13/00 (EP,US);
A61K6/64 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
A61C5/20 (EP,US);
A61C5/70 (EP,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/08 (EP,US);
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61K6/887, C08L75/16 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | GEHÄRTETE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTENDE ZAHNPROTHESENZAHNSYSTEME MIT AUSGLEICHSFUNKTION | [2018/45] | English: | BALANCE FUNCTIONING DENTURE TOOTH SYSTEMS CONTAINING TOUGHENED COMPOSITIONS | [2018/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE DENT DE DENTIER À FONCTIONNEMENT ÉQUILIBRÉ CONTENANT DES COMPOSITIONS DURCIES | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 27.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/19] | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5127834 (HASEGAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 3,11-13 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 15 * * column 10, line 4 - line 39 * * col. 17, comparative ex. 4 * [Y] 1-13; | [XD]US6384107 (LIU ANDREW T C [US]) [XD] 3,11-13 * column 16 - column 17; examples 1,2,3 *; | [Y]US2014131908 (SUN BENJAMIN JIEMIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1,12-19 * * page 7; example 5 * * page 9; example 12 * * page 11; examples 25,28 *; | [I]US2015038634 (SUN BENJAMIN JIEMIN [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * page 2, paragraphs [0014],[0018] * * page 4, paragraph [0027] - paragraphs [0028],[0032] * * page 5; table 1 * * page 6 - page 7; examples 2,4,6,11,12,16-17 * * page 6, paragraphs [0042],[0051]; claims 1-3,7,8 *; | [T] - Org B Leucite ET AL, "Sicherheitsfdatenblatt Colacryl TS 1785/1", (20150724), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://lucitepartners.com/external/acryww55.nsf/ByCountryWEB/18133784EAEA353180257E8C0049A6A4/$File/CLP_COLACRYL_TS1785-1(REACH-CLP)-GERMANY.PDF, (20170308), XP055352955 | by applicant | US4396476 | US4396377 | US4698373 | EP0677286 | US6063830 | US6384107 | EP1264581 | US7189076 | US7368486 |