EP3243635 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATION SHAPING DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATION SHAPING DEVICE, AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATION SHAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technology Research Association for Future Additive Manufacturing 6F Nihonbashi First Bldg. 2-19, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIITANI Haruhiko c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-MITSUBISHI HEAVY-INDUSTRIES-MACHINE-TOOL-RITTO SUBOFFICE 130 Rokujizo Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3080 / JP | 02 /
AKAMA Satoru c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-MITSUBISHI HEAVY-INDUSTRIES-MACHINE-TOOL-RITTO SUBOFFICE 130 Rokujizo Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3080 / JP | 03 /
WAKANA Tomohiro c/o TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION FOR FUTURE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING TRAFAM-MITSUBISHI HEAVY-INDUSTRIES-MACHINE-TOOL-RITTO SUBOFFICE 130 Rokujizo Ritto-shi Shiga 520-3080 / JP | [2017/47] |
Former [2017/46] | 01 /
NIITANI, Haruhiko c/o Technology Research Association for Future Additive Manufacturing Trafam-Mitsubishi-Heavy-Industries- Machine-Tool-Ritto Suboffice, 130, Rokujizo Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3080 / JP | ||
02 /
AKAMA, Satoru c/o Technology Research Association for Future Additive Manufacturing Trafam-Mitsubishi-Heavy-Industries- Machine-Tool-Ritto Suboffice, 130, Rokujizo Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3080 / JP | |||
03 /
WAKANO, Tomohiro c/o Technology Research Association for Future Additive Manufacturing Trafam-Mitsubishi-Heavy-Industries- Machine-Tool-Ritto Suboffice, 130, Rokujizo Ritto-shi, Shiga 520-3080 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/46] | Application number, filing date | 16826687.2 | 25.03.2016 | [2017/46] | WO2016JP59766 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017163431 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3243635 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3243635 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B29C64/106, B29C64/194, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B29C64/106 (EP,US);
B22F10/25 (EP,US);
B22F10/50 (EP,US);
B22F12/37 (EP,US);
B23K26/342 (US);
B23K28/02 (US);
B29C64/194 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (US);
B22F10/36 (EP,US);
B22F12/33 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | B29C67/00, B22F3/105, B22F3/16, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/00, B33Y10/00, B29C64/112, B29C64/153, B29C64/118 | ||
Former IPC [2017/46] | B29C67/00, B22F3/105, B22F3/16, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DREIDIMENSIONALEN LAMINIERUNG UND FORMUNG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR VORRICHTUNG ZUR DREIDIMENSIONALEN LAMINIERUNG UND FORMUNG UND STEUERUNGSPROGRAMM FÜR VORRICHTUNG ZUR DREIDIMENSIONALEN LAMINIERUNG UND FORMUNG | [2017/46] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATION SHAPING DEVICE, METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATION SHAPING DEVICE, AND PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATION SHAPING DEVICE | [2017/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMAGE EN STRATES EN TROIS DIMENSIONS, PROCÉDÉ POUR LA COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE FORMAGE EN STRATES EN TROIS DIMENSIONS ET PROGRAMME POUR LA COMMANDE DU DISPOSITIF DE FORMAGE EN STRATES EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | Translation filed | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2016 | AL | 05.05.2021 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | TR | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.03.2016 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.03.2016 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.03.2016 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010006228 (ABE SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * claims 1-26 * * paragraphs [0077] , [0083] * [I] 2; | [XI]WO2015012992 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 1, lines 7-18 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 10 * * page 19, lines 7-11 * * page 20, lines 13-24 * [I] 2; | [A]US2015142160 (OHNISHI MASARU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]JP5840312B (MATSUURA KIKAI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 1-5* claims 1-13 * | International search | [A]JP2010132960 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) [A] 1-5* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2015196856 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-5 * , claims 1 to 3; paragraphs [0033] to [0034], [0040] to [0041], [0052], [0062] to [0065], [0077] to [0081]; fig. 1 to 9 & WO 2015/151840 A1 * | by applicant | JP2010280173 |