EP3324740 - METHOD FOR FRUIT THINNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adama Agan Ltd. P.O. Box 262 Northern Industrial Zone 7710201 Ashdod / IL | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSELING, Tom Maasdijk 48 5328BG Rossum / NL | 02 /
BONANY, Joan Verges 7 17143 Jafre / ES | 03 /
GUGLIELMO, Costa Via Galliera 60 40121 Bologna / IT | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16827319.1 | 15.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016IB01133 | Priority number, date | US201562194006P | 17.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562194006 P | US201662361760P | 13.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662361760 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017013491 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324740 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/00, A01N47/28, A01N47/30, A01N25/00, A01N43/707 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A01N43/707 (EP,IL,US);
A01N25/00 (EP,IL,US);
A01G7/06 (CN);
A01N43/54 (IL);
A01N43/70 (IL);
A01N43/88 (IL);
A01N47/30 (IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/00, A01N43/54, A01N43/70, A01N43/707, A01N43/88, A01N47/30 (EP,US);
A01N43/707, A01N25/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2018/22] | A01N37/00, A01N47/28, A01N47/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FRUCHTDÜNNUNG | [2018/22] | English: | METHOD FOR FRUIT THINNING | [2018/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE LA FRUCTIFICATION | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 14.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014373438 (BAUR PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-5, 19-21 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015150260 (SAALFELD FRANK [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * entire document *; | [XY] - GREENE, D. W., "Chemicals, timing, and environmental factors involved in thinner efficacy on apple", HortScience, (20020601), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 477 - 481, XP055348057 [X] 19-21 * . entire document * [Y] 1-5 | [A] - GREENE et al., "Development of a Fruitlet Growth Model to Predict Thinner Response on Apples", HortScience, (20130531), vol. 48, no. 5, pages 584 - 587, XP055348059 [A] 1-5, 19-21 * . entire document * | [A] - ROBINSON et al., "Advances in predicting chemical thinner response of apple using a carbon balance model", New York Fruit Quarterly, (20110531), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 15 - 20, XP055348061 [A] 1-5, 19-21 * . entire document * | [A] - STOVER et al., "Environmental Effects on the Performance of Foliar Applied Plant Growth Regulators: A Review Focusing on Tree Fruits", HortTechnology, (20150630), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 214 - 221, XP055281560 [A] 1-5, 19-21 * . entire document * | by applicant | US8826587 |