EP3326510 - MANIPULATOR AND MEDICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARAGUCHI Masafumi c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16827868.7 | 22.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016JP71599 | Priority number, date | US201562195869P | 23.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562195869 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017014308 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326510 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, // A61B34/30, A61B34/35, A61B34/37, A61B90/30 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B1/00006 (EP,US);
A61B1/00133 (EP,US);
A61B1/00149 (EP,US);
A61B1/0016 (EP,US);
A61B1/00193 (EP,US);
A61B1/0055 (EP,US);
A61B1/008 (EP,US);
A61B1/01 (US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B1/05 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B34/35 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B34/74 (EP,US);
A61B90/37 (EP,US);
B25J9/1633 (US);
A61B1/00042 (EP,US);
A61B1/00045 (US);
A61B1/0057 (US);
A61B2017/00367 (US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
A61B2034/303 (EP,US);
A61B2034/306 (EP,US);
A61B2090/061 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
A61B2090/306 (EP,US);
A61B90/30 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | MANIPULATOR UND MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM | [2018/22] | English: | MANIPULATOR AND MEDICAL SYSTEM | [2018/22] | French: | MANIPULATEUR, ET SYSTÈME MÉDICAL | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2018 | Translation filed | 13.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 13.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007059989 (KURA YASUHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0053] , [0070] - [0080]; figures 4-11 *; | [A]US2013345719 (DONHOWE CAITLIN Q [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0029] - [0036] - [0056] , [0057]; figures 2,13 *; | [Y]WO2015012242 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0 42]; figures 1, 4-7A,14 * | International search | [A]WO2005089630 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* , fig. 31; paragraph [0084] & US 2007/0055097 A1 fig. 31; paragraph [0178] *; | [XA]WO2005110192 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * , fig. 3 to 9; paragraphs [0030] to [0033], [0038] & US 2007/0066104 A1 fig. 3 to 9; paragraphs [0062] to [0066], [0071] * [A] 2-7; | [XA]WO2006035566 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * , fig. 2 to 3; paragraphs [0016] to [0020], [0028] to [0029] & US 2007/0173093 A1 fig. 2 to 3; paragraphs [0032] to [0037], [0046] to [0047] * [A] 2-7 |