EP3325005 - IDENTIFICATION OF IMMUNOGENIC MHC CLASS II PEPTIDES FOR IMMUNE-BASED THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Czerniecki, Brian, J. 77 Chews Landing Road Haddonfield, NJ 08033 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZERNIECKI, Brian, J. 905 Harbour Bay Drive Tampa, FL 33602 / US | 02 /
KOSKI, Gary, K. 4585 Granger Road Akron, OH 44333 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16828158.2 | 04.03.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US21042 | Priority number, date | WO2015US41034 | 17.07.2015 Original published format: PCT/US2015/041034 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017014810 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325005 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, A61K39/00, C07K14/71, C12N5/0783, C12N5/0784, A61P35/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
A61K39/001106 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/464406 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
G01N33/56972 (US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
G01N33/57492 (US);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
A61K2039/55 (EP,US);
A61K2039/812 (EP,US);
A61K2039/828 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | A61K39/00, C07K14/71, C12N5/0783, C12N5/0784 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIKATION VON IMMUNOGENEN MHC-KLASSE-II-PEPTIDEN FÜR IMMUNBASIERTE THERAPIE | [2018/22] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF IMMUNOGENIC MHC CLASS II PEPTIDES FOR IMMUNE-BASED THERAPY | [2018/22] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE PEPTIDES IMMUNOGÈNES DE CLASSE II DU COMPLEXE MAJEUR D'HISTOCOMPATIBILITÉ POUR UNE IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 17.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9108214 (US HEALTH [US]) [X] 1 * abstract ** example 5; claims 3,15,17,18, *; | [X] - DUNFA PENG ET AL, "Alterations in Barrett's-related adenocarcinomas: A proteomic approach", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20080315), vol. 122, no. 6, doi:10.1002/ijc.23258, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 1303 - 1310, XP055178816 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.23258 | International search | [A]WO2007115571 (ENKAM PHARMACEUTICALS AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-24 * entir document *; | [A]US2011229478 (ZHOU MINGDONG [CN]) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [X]US2014112931 (CHARDES THIERRY [FR], et al) [X] 1 * entire document *; | [X]WO2015048793 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 24 * entire document *; | [PX]WO2016011343 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [PX] 1-24* entire document *; | [A] - MASUELLI et al., "Gene -specific inhibition of breast carcinoma in BALB-neuT mice by active immunization with rat Neu or human ErbB receptors", International Journal of Oncology, (20070201), vol. 30, pages 381 - 392, XP055347476 [A] 1-24 * . entire document * | [A] - MILLER et al., "HER-3 peptide vaccines/mimics: Combined therapy with IGF-1R, HER-2, and HER-1 peptides induces synergistic anti-tumor effects against breast and pancreatic cancer CeIIS", Oncolmmunology, (20141101), vol. 3, no. Iss. 10, pages 1 - 17, XP055275673 [A] 1-24 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/21624011.2014.956012 |