EP3325269 - STRUCTURE REINFORCEMENT WITH POLYMER MATRIX COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation 6900 Main Street P.O. Box 9729 Stratford, CT 06615 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Wenping 102 Gates Farm Road Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
CHAUDHRY, Zaffir A. 118 S. Mill Drive S. Glastonbury, Connecticut 06073 / US | 03 /
TONI, Darryl Mark 22 Waterside Lane Clinton, Connecticut 06413 / US | 04 /
KUMMER, Peter 195 Stagecoarch Circle Milford, Connecticut 06460 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16828252.3 | 13.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US42031 | Priority number, date | US201562196005P | 23.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196005 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015016 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325269 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, B32B37/22, E04B1/24, E04C3/29, E04C3/36, B23P6/04, E04G23/02 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B64F5/40 (EP,US);
B23P6/00 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
E04C3/29 (EP,US);
E04G23/0244 (EP,US);
B23P2700/01 (EP,US);
B29C73/10 (EP,US);
B29C73/14 (EP,US);
B32B2037/1253 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | B32B15/08, B32B37/22, E04B1/24, E04C3/29, E04C3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | STRUKTURVERSTÄRKUNG MIT POLYMERMATRIXVERBUND | [2018/22] | English: | STRUCTURE REINFORCEMENT WITH POLYMER MATRIX COMPOSITE | [2018/22] | French: | RENFORCEMENT STRUCTUREL AVEC COMPOSITE À MATRICE POLYMÈRE | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 15.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2021 | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | 31.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 23.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1468030 (DASSAULT AVIONS) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5166007 (SMITH W NOVIS [US], et al) [X] 1-15* figures 2-3 *; | [X]US2006283133 (WESTRE WILLARD N [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure - *; | [X]US2014295125 (ARIKAWA KIWAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure - *; | [X]US2014318057 (ZHAO WENPING [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [P]US9243407 (ZHAO WENPING [US], et al) | International search | [X]US2006283133 (WESTRE WILLARD N [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 9, 11-13 * entire document *; | [A]US3487518 (HOPFELD HENRY) [A] 1, 3, 9, 11-13 * entire document *; | [A]US5476704 (KOEHLER DIETER [AT]) [A] 1, 3, 9, 11-13 * entire document *; | [A]US5166007 (SMITH W NOVIS [US], et al) [A] 1, 3, 9, 11-13 * entire document * | by applicant | US2014318057 | GB1468030 | US2014295125 | US2006283133 | US5166007 |