EP3324832 - SYSTEMS FOR LESION FORMATION AND ASSESSMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LESION FORMATION AND ASSESSMENT | ||
[2022/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 460Medical, Inc. 33 Huron Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Luxcath, LLC 33 Arch Street Suite 3201 Boston, Massachusetts 02110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANSBURY, Terrance J. 112 Simerville Road Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27517 / US | 02 /
ARMSTRONG, Kenneth C. 104 Modena Drive Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 03 /
AMIRANA, Omar 21 LilacCourt Cambridge, Massachusetts 02141 / US | 04 /
LARSON, Cinnamon 1549 Pathway Drive Carrboro, North Carolina 27510 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16828397.6 | 19.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US42891 | Priority number, date | US201562194276P | 19.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562194276 P | US201514919004 | 21.10.2015 Original published format: US201514919004 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015257 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324832 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3324832 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B18/02, A61B18/14, A61B18/24, A61N7/00, A61B90/30, A61B34/20 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
A61B90/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/00 (CN);
A61B18/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/1206 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0071 (CN);
A61B5/0084 (CN);
A61B5/4836 (CN);
A61B5/6852 (CN);
A61B5/6869 (CN);
A61B90/361 (EP,KR,US);
A61B90/37 (EP,KR,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00061 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00357 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00363 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00375 (CN);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2018/0066 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00904 (CN);
A61B2018/0091 (CN);
A61B2018/00982 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2018/00994 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/1861 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/306 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR LÄSIONSBILDUNG UND BEWERTUNG | [2022/31] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR LESION FORMATION AND ASSESSMENT | [2022/31] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR LA FORMATION ET L'ÉVALUATION DE LÉSIONS | [2022/31] |
Former [2018/22] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR LÄSIONSBILDUNG UND BEWERTUNG | ||
Former [2018/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR LESION FORMATION AND ASSESSMENT | ||
Former [2018/22] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA FORMATION ET L'ÉVALUATION DE LÉSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 19.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2023
06.10.2023
ADMISSIBLE Biorem AG c/o Wirtschaftsprüfung Trevisca AG Zugerstrasse 74 6340 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [2023/46] | 18.10.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | LU | 19.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
LU | 19.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
LU | 19.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006089636 (CHRISTOPHERSON MARK A [US], et al); | [Y]US2007270717 (TANG JING [US], et al); | [X]US2009131931 (LEE JAMES K [US], et al); | [XY]EP2889013 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]); | [PX]WO2016073492 (LUXCATH LLC [US]) | International search | [Y]US2006089636 (CHRISTOPHERSON MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 10/(1-2,4-8) 21/(12-13,15- 19), 35/(23-27,29-33), 37, 38 * ; entire dooumont, ocpecially Abstract; Fig. 1. *; | [A]US2006122587 (SHARAREH SHIVA [US]) [A] 1-28* ; entire document. *; | [XYA]US2009131931 (LEE JAMES K [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4-5, (9,11)/(1-2,4-8), 12-13, 15-19, (20, 22)/(12 -13, 15-19) * ; entire document, especially Figs. 1, 4A, 7; paras. [0013], [0050]-[0055], [0059], [0065], [0078]. * [Y] 10/(1-2,4-8), 21/(12-13,15 -19), 23-27, 29-33, (34- 36)/(23-27,29-33), 37-38 [A] 3, 9-11/(3), 14, (20- 22)/(14), 28, (34-36)/(28); | [YA]US2013102862 (MERCADER MARCO A [US], et al) [Y] 23-27, 29-33, (34-36)/(23- 27,29-33) * ; entire document, especially Figs. 1A-C, 3; 11B; para. [0052]-[0058], [0061], [0071]-[0076], [0099]. * [A] 28, (34-36)/(28); | [A]US2014088418 (RADULESCU EMIL [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * ; entire document, especially Fig. 4B, para. [0053], [0055]. * | by applicant | US2006089636 | US2007270717 | US2009131931 | EP2889013 | Opposition | US6485413 | US2003125719 | US2006089636 | US2006122587 | US2007179487 | US2007270717 | US2008021275 | US7417740 | US2009131931 | US2010081873 | JP2012052882 | US2013023865 | US2013102862 | US2014088418 | WO2014205256 | US2014378846 | EP2889013 | US9087368 | US9186066 | WO2016073492 |