EP3389720 - POLYACETAL POLYMERS, CONJUGATES, PARTICLES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | For all designated states Xtuit Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1000 Winter Street, Suite 3350 Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUME-JENSEN, Peter 351 Dudley Road Newton MA 02459 / US | 02 /
CHICKERING, Donald, E., III 3 Holly Way Framingham MA 01701 / US | 03 /
KOPESKY, Paul, W. 7 Mason Street Lexington MA 02421 / US | 04 /
REITER, Lawrence, A. 32 West Mystic Ave. Mystic CT 06355 / US | 05 /
CRANE, Alan 25 Quidnic Road Newton MA 02468 / US | 06 /
LANGER, Robert, S. 98 Montvale Rd. Newton MA 02459 / US | 07 /
TONG, Rong 100 Memorial Drive Apt. 8-20B Cambridge MA 02142-1331 / US | 08 /
JAIN, Rakesh, K. 14 Squirrel Road Wellesley MA 02481 / US | 09 /
CHAUHAN, Vikash, Pal, Singh 5 Peabody Terrace Apt. 32 Boston MA 02138 / US | 10 /
INCIO, Joao c/o The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston MA 02114 / US | 11 /
FUKUMURA, Dai 28 Nightingale Path Newton MA 02459 / US | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Carmody, Mark PurdyLucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 P210 Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 16829358.7 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US67149 | Priority number, date | US201562269438P | 18.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562269438 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106630 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389720 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/60 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C08G65/48 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | POLYACETALPOLYMERE, KONJUGATE, PARTIKEL UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/43] | English: | POLYACETAL POLYMERS, CONJUGATES, PARTICLES AND USES THEREOF | [2018/43] | French: | POLYMÈRES POLYACÉTAL, CONJUGUÉS, PARTICULES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 07.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004009082 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al)[A] 1-30,34-43; | [XY] - YUDAN GU ET AL, "Acetal-Linked Paclitaxel Prodrug Micellar Nanoparticles as a Versatile and Potent Platform for Cancer Therapy", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (20130812), vol. 14, no. 8, doi:10.1021/bm400615n, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 2772 - 2780, XP055357256 [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 1-30,34-43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm400615n | [X] - KIM J K ET AL, "Novel pH-sensitive polyacetal-based block copolymers for controlled drug delivery", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS,, vol. 401, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2010.08.029, ISSN 0378-5173, (20101130), pages 79 - 86, (20100827), XP027450387 [X] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2010.08.029 | [Y] - MONTSERRAT MORENO ET AL, "Reduction of advanced liver fibrosis by short-term targeted delivery of an angiotensin receptor blocker to hepatic stellate cells in rats", HEPATOLOGY, (20100101), doi:10.1002/hep.23419, ISSN 0270-9139, pages NA - NA, XP055356986 [Y] 1-30,34-43 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.23419 | [A] - GODUGU CHANDRAIAH ET AL, "Inhalation delivery of Telmisartan enhances intratumoral distribution of nanoparticles in lung cancer models", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20130707), vol. 172, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2013.06.036, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 86 - 95, XP028772902 [A] 1-30,34-43 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2013.06.036 | [A] - MIAO LEI ET AL, "Stromal barriers and strategies for the delivery of nanomedicine to desmoplastic tumors", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150812), vol. 219, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2015.08.017, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 192 - 204, XP029303650 [A] 1-30,34-43 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2015.08.017 | [A] - B. DIOP-FRIMPONG ET AL, "Losartan inhibits collagen I synthesis and improves the distribution and efficacy of nanotherapeutics in tumors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20110131), vol. 108, no. 7, doi:10.1073/pnas.1018892108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2909 - 2914, XP055176833 [A] 1-30,34-43 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1018892108 | by applicant | US5013556 | US5021409 | US5583131 | US5843439 | WO9950461 | WO9952552 | US6001826 | US6274552 | WO0185196 | WO0194420 | US6399061 | WO03011277 | WO03079972 | WO03090512 | US2003220341 | US6682134 | US2004047858 | US2004209921 | US2005043367 | US2005059702 | US2005277670 | WO2006014626 | US7132255 | WO2006121168 | WO2007005874 | US7229841 | US7244448 | EP1839655 | US7387900 | US7495099 | US7534449 | WO2009101611 | US2009221683 | WO2009114335 | US7622454 | WO2010005726 | WO2010005723 | WO2010005721 | WO2010005740 | WO2010019570 | US2010055088 | EP2161336 | WO2010068866 | WO2010075072 | WO2010077634 | US2010178271 | US7780984 | US2010247521 | US7811602 | US7820788 | WO2010121949 | WO2010125571 | US7846908 | US2010310465 | US2011008364 | US7943743 | US8008449 | US2012039906 | WO2012068531 | US8193334 | US2012207795 | US8314230 | US2012301498 | WO2013006490 | US8354509 | US2013028941 | US8389499 | US8404799 | WO2013054331 | WO2013082366 | US2013156774 | US8513390 | US8541203 | US8580244 | WO2013169739 | US8603454 | WO2014022332 | WO2014059251 | US8722082 | US8747869 | US2014199340 | US2014271618 | US2015087810 | - JONES, D., NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2007), vol. 6, pages 174 - 175 | - MOGHIMI, S. M., FASEH J., (2005), vol. 19, pages 311 - 330 | - JAIN, R. K., NAT MED, (1998), vol. 4, pages 655 - 657 | - SANHAI, W. R. ET AL., NAT NANOTECHNOL, (2008), vol. 3, pages 242 - 244 | - CHAUHAN, V ET AL., ANNU REV CHEM BIOMOL 1,,NG., (2011), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 281 - 98 | - VAN KEMPEN ET AL., EUR CANCER, (2006), vol. 42, pages 728 - 734 | - DESNOYERS, L.R. ET AL., SCI TRANSL MED, (2013), vol. 5, page 207RAI44 | - RICE, J.J. ET AL., PROTEIN SCI, (2006), vol. 15, pages 825 - 836 | - BOULWARE, K.T.; DAUGHERTY, P.S., PROC NAIL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 7583 - 7588 | - DEPERTHES, D., BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 383, pages 1107 - 1112 | - HARRIS, J.L., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 7754 - 7759 | - SALMASO S.; CALICETI, P., J DRUG DELIV, (2013), vol. 2013, pages 1 - 19 | - DESNOYERS, L.R. ET AL., SCI TRANSL MED, (2013), vol. 5, page 207RAL44 | - S. ULISSE ET AL., CURR. CANCER DRUG TARGETS, (2009), vol. 9, pages 32 - 71 | - K. UHLAND, CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2006), vol. 63, pages 2968 - 2978 | - A. M. LEBEAU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2013), vol. 110, pages 93 - 98 | - C. LIU ET AL., CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 2957 - 2964 | - K. T. BOULWARE; P. S. DAUGHERTY, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.S.A., (2006), vol. 103, pages 7583 - 7588 | - RICE, J J ET AL., PROTEIN SCI, (2006), vol. 15, pages 825 - 836 | - HAAS, M. J. ET AL., SCIBX, (2014), vol. 7, no. 15 | - ACS CHEM BIOI, (2015), vol. 10, pages 22 - 39 | - EXPERT OPIN THER PAT, (2014), vol. 24, pages 185 - 199 | - CLIN CANCER RES, (2015), vol. 21, pages 1628 - 1638 | - ONCOTARGET, (2015), vol. 6, pages 17698 - 17712 | - BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (2015), vol. 25, pages 1842 - 1848 | - CANCER RES, (2013), vol. 73, pages 3336 - 3346 | - J MED CHEM, (2013), vol. 56, pages 9251 - 9264 | - LOB, S. ET AL., NAT REV CANCER, (2009), vol. 9, pages 445 - 452 | - ROHRIG, U.F. ET AL., M' CHEM, (2015), vol. 58, pages 9421 - 9437 | - SALMASO S; CALICETI, P, J DRUG DELIV, (2013), vol. 2013, pages 1 - 19 | - J PHARM SCI., (201102), vol. 100, no. 2, pages 646 - 54 | - ADORINI, CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 233, pages 115 - 124 | - SERPE, EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPARM., (2004), vol. 58, pages 673 - 680 | - LU ET AL., EUR. J. PHARM. SCI., (2006), vol. 28, pages 86 - 95 | - HU ET AL., J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (2009), vol. 134, pages 55 - 61 | - CHENG ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2007), vol. 28, pages 869 - 876 | - CHAN, BIOMATERIALS, (2009), vol. 30, pages 1627 - 1634 | - DANHHIER ET AL., J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (2009), vol. 133, pages 11 - 17 | - GRYPARIS ET AL., EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (2007), vol. 67, pages 1 - 8 | - WANG, A. Z. ET AL., ANM . REV. MED., (2012), vol. 63, pages 185 - 98 | - SEMPLE, S.C., "Rational design of cationic lipids for siRNA delivery", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1038/NBT.1602, pages 172 - 176, XP002633693 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.1602 | - MOON, JJ; SUH, H ET AL., "Interbilayer-crosslinked multilamellar vesicles as synthetic vaccines for potent humoral and cellular immune responses", NATURE MATERIALS, (2011), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nmat2960, pages 243 - 251, XP055020205 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmat2960 | - HRKACH, J. ET AL., "Preclinical development and clinical translation of a PSMA-targeted docetaxel nanoparticle with a differentiated pharmalogical profile", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, (2012), vol. 4, pages 1 - 12 | - CROISSANT, J., "Two-photon-triggered drug delivery via fluorescent nanovalves", SMALL, (2014), vol. 10, pages 1752 - 1755 | - T.R. HARRISON ET AL., Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, 13th Edition,, MCGRAW-HILL NY, NY | - GOODMAN; OILMAN'S, The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, . | - JOHNSTON CI, LANCET, (1995), vol. 346, pages 1403 - 1407 | - HABASHI JP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 312, pages 117 - 121 | - COHN RD ET AL., NAT MED, (2007), vol. 13, pages 204 - 210 | - LAVOIE P ET AL., ./ HYPERTENS, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1895 - 1903 | - CHAMBERLAIN JS, NAT MED, (2007), vol. 13, pages 125 - 126 | - DIETZ HC, J CLIN INVEST, (2010), vol. 120, pages 403 - 407 | - STECKELINGS, UM ET AL., CURR OPIN NEPHROL HYPERTENS, (2012), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 142 - 6 | - STECKELINGS, UM ET AL., CURR OPIN PHARMACOL., (2011), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 187 - 192 | - GOEL ET AL., PHYSIOL REV., (2011), vol. 91, pages 1071 - 1121 | - JAIN, CANCER CELL, (2014), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 605 - 622 | - PROVENZANO, P., CANCER CELL, (2012), vol. 21, pages 418 - 429 | - OLIVE, K.P., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, pages 1457 - 61 | - SUGAHARA, KN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 328, pages 1031 - 5 | - YE, Y. ET AL., BI | - GRIFFON-ETIENNE, G ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, no. 15, pages 3776 - 82 | - SYED ALWI SS ET AL., BR. J. NUTR., (2010), vol. 104, no. 9, pages 1288 - 96 | - SEMENZA GL, DRUG DISCOV. TODAY, (2007), vol. 12, no. 19-20, pages 853 - 9 | - MELILLO G, ALOL. CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 4, no. 9, pages 601 - 5 | - SCHIOPPA, T. ET AL., J EXP MED, (2003), vol. 198, pages 1391 - 1402 | - CHANG, Q. ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2011), vol. 71, pages 3110 - 3120 | - GAO, Z. ET AL., PANCREATOLOGY, (2010), vol. 10, pages 186 - 193 | - MORIYAMA, T. ET AL., CANCER, (2010), vol. 116, pages 3357 - 3368 | - HERMANN, P. C. ET AL., CELL STEM CELL, (2007), vol. 1, pages 313 - 323 | - SINGH, S ET AL., BR J CANCER, (2010), vol. 103, pages 1671 - 1679 | - LIANG, J. J. ET AL., CANCER EPIDEMIOLOGY BIOMARKERS & PREVENTION, (2010), vol. 19, pages 2598 - 2604 | - MARECHAL, R. ET AL., BR J CANCER, (2009), vol. 100, pages 1444 - 1451 | - HAMA, K., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (2006), vol. 340, pages 742 - 750 | - HAMA, K. ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2004), vol. 315, pages 905 - 911 | - SHIMIZU, K. ET AL., J GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL, (2008), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 119 - 121 | - RODRIGUEZ-VITA, J. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2005), vol. 111, pages 2509 - 2517 | - YANG, F. ET AL., HYPERTENSION, (2009), vol. 54, pages 877 - 884 | - ELENBAAS, B.; WEINBERG, R. A., EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 264, pages 169 - 184 | - CHU, P. Y ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (2010), vol. 176, pages 1735 - 1742 | - TAMAMURA, H. ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM, (2003), vol. 1, pages 3656 - 3662 | - FEBS LETTER, (2003), vol. 550, no. 1-3, pages 79 - 83 | - WONG, D. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 14, no. 24, pages 7975 - 7980 | - MARTINEZ-OUTSCHOOM, U. ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2014), pages 5 - 7 | - VALENCIA, T. ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2014), vol. 26, pages 121 - 135 | - ZHAO ET AL., CELL DEATH AND DISEASE, (2013), vol. 4, page E532 | - NGIOW ET AL., CANCER RES, (2011), vol. 71, pages 3540 - 3551 | - MONNEY ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 415, pages 536 - 541 | - ZHENG ET AL., PLOS ONE, (20100902), vol. 5, no. 9, page E12529 | - ALLEN ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1995), vol. 1237, pages 99 - 108 | - DEFREES ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMISTRY SOCIETY, (1996), vol. 118, pages 6101 - 6104 | - BLUME, BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1993), vol. 1149, pages 180 - 184 | - KLIBANOV ET AL., JOURNAL OF LIPOSOME RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 2, pages 321 - 334 | - ZALIPSKY, BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 296 - 299 | - ZALIPSKY, FEBSLETTERS, (1994), vol. 353, pages 71 - 74 | - SAPRA, P.; ALLEN, TM, PROG. LIPID RES., (2003), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 439 - 62 | - ABRA, RM ET AL., J. LIPOSOME RES., (2002), vol. 12, pages 1 - 3 | - DIETZ, H C., NEW ENGL J MED, (2010), vol. 363, no. 9, pages 852 - 863 | - SOUNNI, N. E ET AL., DISEASES MODELS & MECHANISMS, (2010), vol. 3, pages 317 - 332 | - PROVENZANO, P. ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2012), vol. 21, pages 418 - 429 | - OLIVE, K.P. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, pages 1457 - 61 | - YE, Y. ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT., (2011), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 1146 - 50 | - GRIFFON-ETIENNE, G. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, no. 15, pages 3776 - 82 | - SINGH, S. ET AL., BR J CANCER, (2010), vol. 103, pages 1671 - 1679 | - HAMA, K. ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (2004), vol. 315, pages 905 - 911 | - SHIMIZU, K. ET AL., L GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL, (2008), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 119 - 121 | - ELENBAAS, B; WEINBERG, R. A., EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 264, pages 169 - 184 | - CHU, P. Y. ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (2010), vol. 176, pages 1735 - 1742 | - TAMAMURA, H. ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 1, pages 3656 - 3662 | - WONG, D. ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 14, no. 24, pages 7975 - 7980 | - IYER, S.N. ET AL., INFLAMMATION, (2000), vol. 24, pages 477 - 491 | - BYUNG-SEOK, L. ET AL., J OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1998), vol. 83, no. 1, pages 219 - 223 | - BURGHARDT, I. ET AL., BIOCHEM AND BIOPHYS RES. COMM., (2007), vol. 354, pages 542 - 547 | - LI ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (2007), vol. 87, pages 225 - 230 | - LIU ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2007), vol. 17, pages 617 - 620 | - THORPE, P.E., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 415 - 427 | - MURRAY,./., NUC. AFED, (1985), vol. 26, page 3328 | - CARRAGUILLO ET AL., J. NUC. MED., (1985), vol. 26, page 67 | - SETON-ROGERS, S., NATURE REVIEWS CANCER, (2012), vol. 12, pages 230 - 231 | - PALUCKA, K. ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS CANCER, (2012), vol. 12, pages 265 - 277 | - BIRD, L., NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 12, page 227 | - LEAVY, O., NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 12, page 227 | - PARDOLL, D.M., NATURE REVIEWS CANCER, (2012), vol. 12, pages 252 - 264 | - AGOSTINIS, P. ET AL., CA CANCER J. CLIL, (2011), vol. 61, pages 250 - 281 | - AGOSTINIS, P., CA CANCER.!. CLIU., (2011), vol. 61, pages 250 - 281 | - GRIFFON-ETIENNE, G., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, no. 15, pages 3776 - 82 | - BIRD, L, NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 12, page 227 | - LEAVY, O, NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 12, page 227 | - AGOSTINIS, P. ET AL., CA CANCER J. CLIN., (2011), vol. 61, pages 250 - 281 | - GREEN, FH ET AL., TOXICOL PALHOL., (2007), vol. 35, pages 136 - 47 | - LESLIE, KO, SEMINRESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (2007), vol. 28, pages 369 - 78 | - SWIGRIS, JJ ET AL., CHEST, (2008), vol. 133, pages 271 - 80 | - ANTONIOU, KM ET AL., CURR OPIN RHEUMATOL., (2008), vol. 20, pages 686 - 91 | - PARAMOTHAYAN, S ET AL., RESPIR MED., (2008), vol. 102, pages 1 - 9 | - CATANE, R ET AL., INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOL PHYS, (1979), vol. 5, pages 1513 - 8 | - ZISMAN, DA ET AL., SARCOIDOSIS VASC DIFFUSE LUNG DIS., (2001), vol. 18, pages 243 - 52 | - RAKITA, L ET AL., AM HEART J., (1983), vol. 106, pages 906 - 16 | - TWOHIG, KJ ET AL., CLIN CHEST MED., (1990), vol. 11, pages 31 - 54 | - WITTEN CM., ARCH PHYS MED REHABIL, (1989), vol. 70, pages 55 - 7 | - STEELE, MP ET AL., RESPIRATION, (2007), vol. 74, pages 601 - 8 | - BRASS, DM ET AL., PROC AM THORAC SOC., (2007), vol. 4, pages 92 - 100 | - BOIS RM., SEMINRESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (2006), vol. 27, pages 581 - 8 | - ABDEL-WAHAB, O. ET AL., ANM . REV. MED., (2009), vol. 60, pages 233 - 45 | - VARICCHIO, L. ET AL., EXPERT REV. HEMATOL., (2009), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 315 - 334 | - AGRAWAL, M. ET AL., CANCER, (2010), pages 1 - 15 | - MATHIOWITZ; LANGER, J. CONTROL RELEASE, (1987), vol. 5, page 13 | - MATHIOWITZ ET AL., REACTIVE POLYMERS, (1987), vol. 6, page 275 | - MATHIOWITZ ET AL., J. APPL. POLYMER SCI., (1988), vol. 35, page 755 | - LANGER, ACC. CHEM. RES, (2000), vol. 33, page 94 | - LANGER, J CONTROL. RELEASE, (1999), vol. 62, page 7 | - UHRICH ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1999), vol. 99, page 3181 | - ZHOU ET AL., J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (2001), vol. 75, page 27 | - HANES ET AL., PHARM. BIOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 6, page 389 | - WILLETT ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, pages 3020 - 6 | - BATCHELOR ET AL., .1. CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2010), vol. 28, pages 2817 - 23 | - WILLETT ET AL., THE ONCOLOGIST, (2010), vol. 15, pages 845 - 851 | - WILLETT, THE ONCOLOGIST, (2010), vol. 15, pages 845 - 851 | - SALEEM ET AL., THE LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, pages 2125 - 2131 | - MEISAMY, RADIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 233, pages 424 - 431 | - PERIK ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2006), vol. 24, pages 2276 - 2282 | - SORENSEN ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2012), vol. 72, pages 402 - 407 | - PARK ET AL., RADIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 250, pages 110 - 117 | - SINGH ET AL., EUROPEAN J. OF RADIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 75, pages EL 58 - 162 | - RAJENDRAN ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 12, pages 5435 - 5441 | - LE ET AL., INTERNATIONAL J. OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY BIOLOGY PHYSICS, (2007), vol. 69, pages 167 - 175 | - RADEMAKERS ET AL., BMC CANCER, (2011), vol. 11, page 167 | - SHANKAR ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 47, pages 1059 - 1066 | - BOUCHER ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 51, pages 6691 - 6694 | - OLIVE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 324, page 1475 | - HU ET AL., JNCI, (2011), vol. 103, pages 893 - 905 | - PRIMEAU ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 11, pages 8782 - 8788 | - NETTI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 60, pages 2497 - 2503 | - PLUEN, PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 4628 - 4633 | - PROVENZANO ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2012), vol. 21, pages 418 - 429 | - BAISH ET AL., PNAS, (2011), vol. 108, pages 1799 - 1803 | - PADERA ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 427, page 695 | - MAZZONE ET AL., CELL, (2009), vol. 136, pages 839 - 851 | - KAANDERS, J. H. ET AL., CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 7066 - 7074 | - EVANS, S. M. ET AL., INT. J. RADIAT. ONCOL.BIOL. PHYS., (2007), vol. 69, pages 1024 - 1031 | - KOUKOURAKIS, M. I. ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2006), vol. 24, pages 727 - 735 | - ERLER, J. T. ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 440, pages 1222 - 1226 | - BOS, R. ET AL., CANCER, (2003), vol. 97, pages 1573 - 1581 | - YAN, BR. J. CANCER, (2009), vol. 101, pages 1168 - 1174 | - NORDSMARK, M. ET AL., RADIOTHER. ONCOL., (2005), vol. 77, pages 18 - 24 | - BRIZEL, D. M. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 941 - 943 | - MOVSAS, B. ET AL., UROLOGY, (2002), vol. 60, pages 634 - 639 | - FYLES, A. ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 680 - 687 | - WILSON; HAYS, NATURE REV CANCER, (2011), vol. 11, pages 393 - 410 | - LOPEZ ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, pages 286 - 291 | - MIELE ET AL., RANSLATIONAL RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 154, pages 194 - 201 | - HARTI ET AL., AMERICAN J. OF RESPIRATORY MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 173, pages 1371 - 1376 | - DIOP-FRIMPONG ET AL., PAIAS, (2011), vol. 108, pages 2909 - 2914 | - PLUEN ET AL., PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 4628 - 4633 |