EP3319322 - BANDWIDTH ADJUSTMENT METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GUAN, Hongguang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WEI, Hanyu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16829726.5 | 27.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016CN87307 | Priority number, date | CN201510458820 | 30.07.2015 Original published format: CN201510458820 | [2018/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017016360 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319322 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/238, H04N21/647 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H04N21/64738 (EP,US);
H04N21/2385 (CN);
H04L47/822 (US);
H04L47/80 (US);
H04N21/238 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | H04N21/238 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | BANDBREITENEINSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/19] | English: | BANDWIDTH ADJUSTMENT METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2018/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AJUSTEMENT DE BANDE PASSANTE ET DISPOSITIF CONNEXE | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2018 | Translation filed | 30.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 30.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 12.10.2021 | Appeal received No. T0277/22 | 12.10.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 04.01.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008080350 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] *; | [I]CN104580018 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]CN104618157 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]US2017324619 (ZHU REN [CN], et al) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0126] * | International search | [A]CN101188562 (HANGZHOU HUASAN COMM TECH CO [CN]) [A] 1-16* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101827017 (BLUEDON INFORMATION SECURITY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103188165 (DIGITAL CHINA NETWORKS BEIJING) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN104486254 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMM CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN104580018 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-16 * , description, paragraphs [0018]-[0049] *; | [X]CN104618157 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-16 * , description, paragraphs [0114]-[0124] * |