EP3393805 - METHOD OF MAKING A LAMINATE WITH A STRETCHED THERMOPLASTIC LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILBERT, Thomas J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
CHANDRASEKARAN, Neelakandan 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Todd L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3437 / US | 04 /
GORMAN, Michael R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
PELTIER, Mark A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16831790.7 | 19.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016US67597 | Priority number, date | US201562270381P | 21.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562270381 P | US201562270407P | 21.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562270407 P | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017112601 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393805 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/14, A61F13/15 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
B32B37/144 (EP,KR,US);
B32B38/0012 (US);
A44B18/0003 (US);
A44B18/0049 (US);
A44B18/0061 (US);
B29C55/08 (US);
B32B27/12 (KR);
B32B27/32 (KR,US);
B32B3/06 (US);
B32B37/12 (KR);
B32B5/022 (KR);
B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2274/00 (US);
B32B2307/546 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2555/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LAMINATS MIT EINER GESTRECKTEN THERMOPLASTISCHEN SCHICHT | [2018/44] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A LAMINATE WITH A STRETCHED THERMOPLASTIC LAYER | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN STRATIFIÉ AVEC UNE COUCHE THERMOPLASTIQUE ÉTIRÉE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 25.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0436878 (SPOHN VERPACKUNGSWERKE GMBH & [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 54; figure 1 *; | [I]WO9828134 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * pages 5,6; figure 2 *; | [A]US2005202205 (PETERSEN JOHANN F [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0107] - [0110]; figure 2 *; | [I]WO2005110719 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * pages 10,11; figure 1 *; | [I]EP2149442 (NORDENIA DEUTSCHLAND GRONAU [DE]) [I] 1-15 * columns 25-27; figure 1 *; | [I]WO2015095749 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * pages 16-18; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4775310 | US4839131 | EP0341993 | US4894060 | US5077870 | EP0539504 | US5260015 | US5389416 | US5691034 | US5845375 | US6075179 | US6106922 | US6132660 | US6190594 | US6190758 | US6287665 | US6582642 | US6627133 | US6767492 | US7198743 | US7214334 | US7373698 | US7423088 | US7897078 | US2011151171 | US2011147475 | US2013289514 | - CHU ET AL., "Microvoid formation process during the plastic deformation of (3-form polypropylene", POLYMER, (1994), vol. 35, no. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/0032-3861(94)90906-7, pages 3442 - 3448, XP024122348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(94)90906-7 | - CHU ET AL., "Crystal transformation and micropore formation during uniaxial drawing of (3-form polypropylene film", POLYMER, (1995), vol. 36, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/0032-3861(95)91197-F, pages 2523 - 2530, XP004025722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(95)91197-F |